Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72713
Short Caption:BAUTISTA VS. PICONE (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72654
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D495928Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:StiglichCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice StiglichPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/18/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs
Expedited

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/03/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
04/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (SEALED)
04/03/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-10904
04/03/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.17-10906
04/11/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Black LoBello & Associates. Check No. 1090.
04/11/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines/Child Custody. Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement & Appendix due: 40 days.17-12000
05/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-15908
05/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Fast Track Statement due: 5 days.17-16988
05/22/2017Fast Track BriefFiled Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement.17-17005
05/23/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/16/15. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services.17-17239
05/23/2017TranscriptFiled Court Reporter's Notice of Non Payment for Appeal Transcripts.17-17240
05/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order To File Appendix and Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. Appellant has filed the fast track statement, but has not filed an appendix as required by NRAP 3E(d)(1), (4). Appendix due: 15 days. Respondent is proceeding in pro se. Having considered the documents transmitted by the district court and appellant's fast track statement, this court has determined that the appointment of pro bono counsel to represent respondent would assist this court in reviewing this appeal. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Notice of Appearance due: 60 days. Briefing Suspended.17-18087
06/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume I of II.17-18272
06/01/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume II of II.17-18274
06/01/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service (Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-2).17-18330
06/19/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplement to Appendix.17-20231
06/19/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service(Appellant's Supplement to Appendix).17-20239
06/26/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sherry Justice stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/16/15.17-21095
07/11/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Benjamin Childs as counsel for the Respondent).17-22881
07/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Fast Track Response due: 20 days.17-24622
08/03/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: August 21, 2017.17-25841
08/07/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Extend Deadline for Response Brief (Fast Track Response).17-26072
08/18/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notice to Vacate Motion to Extend Deadline for Response Brief.17-27674
08/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to respondent's "Notice to Vacate" the motion for extension to file the fast track response, we take no action on respondent's motion filed August 7, 2017. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received via E-Flex on August 20, 2017.17-27947
08/21/2017Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response.17-27948
09/21/2017Case Status UpdateFast Track Briefing Completed.
09/28/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's Notification of Belief that Oral Argument is Unnecessary.17-32959
01/18/2018OtherJustice Lidia Stiglich disqualified from participation in this matter.
01/18/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-02582
05/31/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[The honorable Lidia S. Stiglich, Justice, voluntarily recused herself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 44. EN BANC18-20700
06/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-24101
06/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 29, 2018.18-24101