Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72737
Short Caption:DEMARANVILLE VS. CANNON COCHRAN MGMT. SERV.'S, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 15OC000921BClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/06/2017 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/12/2019 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Represented by NAIW.
04/05/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-11247
04/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-11249
04/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.17-11446
04/06/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.17-11463
04/10/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Sertic Law, Ltd. Check no. 5839. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, Employers Ins. Co. of Nevada)
04/10/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (Employers Ins. Co. of Nevada)17-11816
04/10/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.17-11848
04/12/2017Filing FeeCross-Appeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, City of Reno)
04/12/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (City of Reno)17-12065
04/12/2017Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 100585 returned to McDonald Carano Wilson. (Respondent/Cross-Appellant, City of Reno)
04/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.17-12321
04/20/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.17-13188
04/25/2017Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Docketing Statement.17-13758
04/25/2017Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Employers Insurance Co. of Nevada's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-13759
04/25/2017Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-13774
04/26/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals).17-13929
05/02/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-14444
05/09/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-15333
06/30/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for July 20, 2017 at 10:00 am.17-21956
07/20/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 1, 2017 at 4:00 pm.17-24128
08/31/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-29382
09/11/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Cross-appellant 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-30367
09/14/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-31081
09/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance - Samantha Peiffer, Esq. appearing as counsel for appellant/cross-respondent Laura DeMaranville.17-31082
09/20/2017Transcript RequestFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-31901
09/21/2017Transcript RequestFiled Respondent's Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.17-32005
10/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Respondents/cross-appellants shall each have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why their appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant/cross-respondent may file any reply within 11 days of service of the last-filed response. Briefing of these appeals is suspended.17-34270
11/02/2017MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-37614
11/08/2017MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-38494
11/20/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to Employers Insuranc Eo of America & City of Reno's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-40057
01/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal and Reinstating Briefing. We dismiss Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's cross-appeal. The City of Reno's cross-appeal may proceed. Appellant/cross respondent (appellant) shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. City of Reno shall have 30 days from service of appellant's opening brief to file and serve a combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. EICON and respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services shall each have 30 days from service of City of Reno's combined brief to file and serve their answering briefs. Appellant shall have 30 days from service of the latter filed answering brief to file and serve a combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Finally, City of Reno shall have 30 days from service of appellant's combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal. The briefs shall comply with the page or type-volume limitations of NRAP 32(a)(7)(A) except that any combined brief may contain up to 40 pages or 18,500 words.18-03516
01/30/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-04155
04/24/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant/Cross Respondent's Opening Brief.18-15608
04/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief due: May 23, 2018.18-15618
05/24/2018BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief.18-19869
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-19884
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.18-19886
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.18-19888
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 4.18-19889
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 5.18-19891
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 6.18-19893
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 7.18-19894
05/24/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 8.18-19895
06/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice Chronological Index to Joint Appendix, Volumes 1-818-21409
06/21/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Respondent's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal.18-23668
06/21/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal due: July 25, 2018.18-23670
07/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief.18-28368
07/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Chelsea Latino for Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services Inc.18-28474
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. I.18-28475
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. II.18-28476
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol III.18-28477
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. IV.18-28479
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. V.18-28480
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. VI.18-28481
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol VII.18-28482
07/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Supplemental Appendix Vol. VIII.18-28483
07/25/2018BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of Reno's Opening Brief and Respondent Cannon Cochran Management Services' Answering Brief.18-28484
08/20/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Respondent Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Answering Brief.18-32272
08/20/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Answering Brief due: September 24, 2018.18-32275
09/18/2018BriefFiled Respondent Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Answering Brief.18-36490
10/17/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Combined Reply Brief and Answering Brief.18-40915
10/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal due: November 19, 2018.18-40932
11/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to City of Reno's Answer to Appeal and Response to City of Reno's Cross-Appeal. (SC)18-904914
11/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply to Employers Insurance Company of Nevada's Answering Brief. (SC)18-904922
12/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent/Cross Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-909427
12/19/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
03/06/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Attorney Samantha Peiffer's Application to Withdraw As Counsel of Record. (SC)19-09944
03/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Attorney Samantha Peiffer's motion to withdraw as counsel for appellant/cross-respondent is granted. The clerk shall remove Ms. Peiffer as counsel of record on this court' docket. Appellant/cross-respondent remains represented by attorney Evan Beavers. (SC)19-10615
04/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is schedule for Wednesday, June 12, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-18562
05/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-23267
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
09/05/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-37058