Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72747
Short Caption:DAISY TR. VS. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):63611
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A679095Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/05/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/05/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-11329
04/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-11333
04/05/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn
04/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-11405
04/06/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:17-11433
04/18/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/28/16, 08/02/16. To Court Reporter: Maria Garibay.17-12845
04/26/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-13857
05/10/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Kelly Dove as counsel for the Respondent).17-15733
07/31/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-25285
07/31/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 5, 2017.17-25299
09/06/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-29771
09/06/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-29772
09/28/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (First Request).17-32988
09/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: November 6, 2017.17-32992
10/31/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (Second Request).17-37288
12/11/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on December 6, 2017. Reply Brief due: 30 days.17-42547
12/11/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-42549
12/18/2017BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency in Support of Respondent and of Affirming the District Court's Judgment.17-43700
01/10/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-01478
01/10/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/01/2018MotionFiled Amicus Curiae Federal Housing Finance Agency's Motion to Associate Counsel (Elliott Mogul).18-08275
03/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On March 1, 2018, amicus curiae filed a motion to associate attorney Elliott C. Mogul of the law firm of Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP, in this matter pursuant to SCR 42. We grant the motion. Mr. Mogul shall be permitted to appear on behalf of amicus curiae in this appeal. Nevada attorney Leslie Bryan Hart, of the law firm Fennemore Craig, P.C., shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. Mogul in this matter. See SCR 42(14) and NRAP 25(a)(5).18-11345
07/25/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cadish, J. Majority: Cadish/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. EN BANC (SC)19-31364
08/12/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y19-33851
08/12/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Michael F. Bohn. (SC)