Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72766
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72897, 73837, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/07/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
04/07/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-11670
04/07/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-11673
04/14/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Amended)17-12352
05/18/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "This appeal is dismissed." NNP-EB17-16749
06/14/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-19664
06/14/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/30/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 20, 2017.17-19664