Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72803
Short Caption:FITZGERALD VS. MOBILE BILLBOARDS, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A737119Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/27/2017 / Garcia-Mendoza, EvaSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
04/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-12239
04/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-12241
04/17/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from James P. Kemp
04/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-12765
04/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Case Appeal Statement. Corrected case appeal statement due: 10 days.17-12805
04/24/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Corrected Case Appeal Statement.17-13509
04/27/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eva Garcia-Mendoza.17-14048
05/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-17102
05/23/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief; docketing statement; 10 days.17-17244
06/28/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.17-21458
07/14/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Corrected Case Appeal Statement.17-23524
07/14/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Extend the Appeal Timeline Based on the Dismissal of Defendant Bartello's Bankruptcy Case.17-23526
08/02/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. The clerk shall remove Carrie E. Hurtik, Jonathan R. Patterson, Rachel L. Shelstad, Rachel A. Sloane, and the law firm of Hurtik Law & Associates, from the docket of this appeal. Respondent Vincet Bartello's Notice of Appearance of Counsel or Notice to Proceed in Pro Se due: 30 days. Respondent Mobile Billboards, LLC's Notice of Appearance of Counsel due: 30 days. Appellant's Docketing Statement and Transcript Request Form due: 15 days; Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days.17-25619
08/16/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-27364
10/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Answering Brief and Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. This matter will be decided on the opening brief alone, without an answering brief from either respondent. Conditional sanction of $ 250 due: 15 days or Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.17-36998
10/31/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 13, 2017.17-37195
10/31/2017Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested.17-37235
11/14/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-39141
11/14/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.17-39142
11/14/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/03/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 30. NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-16766
05/30/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-20469
05/30/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/13/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 4, 2018.18-20469