Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72897
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72766, 73837, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/26/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
04/26/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-13921
04/26/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-13923
04/26/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Second NOA)17-13924
04/26/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. (Third NOA)17-13926
06/09/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/25/17. Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis.17-19104
06/09/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Waiving Filing Fee. Appellant is seeking a waiver of the filing fee for this appeal, asserting indigence and inability to pay it. Good cause having been demonstrated, this motion is granted, and thus, no filing fee is due for this appeal.17-19167
06/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.17-19230
06/19/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Amending Caption. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption in this appeal to conform to the caption on this order.17-20243
07/12/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-12 (Via FTP).17-23159
07/12/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 13-25 (Via FTP).17-23196
07/12/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 26-38 (Via FTP).17-23198
07/12/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 39-47 (Via FTP).17-23199
07/18/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 4481-4600, 4601-4782, 4784-4800, 4801-4864, 5824-5853, 7290-7400, 7401-7484, 7519-7526, 7546-7551, 7884-7979, 9037-9041, 9074-9135, 9140-9141 (SEALED).
07/28/2017Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "Motion to Supplement the Record."17-25156
08/10/2017Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "2nd Motion to supplement Record."17-26722
08/16/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed two requests to supplement the record. The complete 47-volume record on appeal has been filed, and parties appearing in pro se are generally not permitted to file appendices. Appellant's request are denied. On June 12, 2017, this court issued a notice directing appellant to file a transcript request form within 15 days and the docketing statement within 20 days. To date appellant has failed to comply with that notice. Docketing Statement and Transcript Request form due: 11 days.17-27389
08/17/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay the Order of Guardian Ad Litem.17-27620
08/17/2017Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document "I am Asking the Nevada Supreme Court to Give me (Eleanor Ahern) Larry Semenza, LTD as My Attorney."17-27621
08/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/09/17, 02/10/17. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza.17-28793
08/28/2017Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-28794
09/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Appellant has filed a motion for a stay pending resolution of this appeal. We deny the motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of appellate counsel. The motion is denied. We decline to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time.17-30733
09/18/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter from Appellant, Eleanor Ahern.17-31325
11/06/2017Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter Asking for an Extension of Time to File Informal Brief.17-37851
11/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny reconsideration. The motion for extension of time filed on November 6, 2017, is granted. The clerks shall file the informal brief related to Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck received on November 7, 2017. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the informal opening brief regarding Marquis Aurbach Coffing received on November 6, 2017. respondent need not file a response unless directed to do so by this court.17-40411
11/22/2017BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief (Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck).17-40412
12/26/2017BriefFiled Respondent Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP's Answering Brief.17-44457
02/08/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Supplemental Response. Respondent's Response due: 30 days. The response shall not exceed 15 pages plus the attorney's certificate required by NRAP 28.2. The response need not include the table of contents and table of cases, statutes, and other authority required by NRAP 28(b).18-18471
05/29/2018Letter/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proper Person Letter Regarding Case.18-20359
06/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed a letter, in pro se, asserting that her appeal relating to the award of legal fees to Marquis Auerbach Coffing, Docket No. 72766, has been conflated or made a part of her appeal relating to the award of legal fees to Browstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Docket No. 72897. Appellant asks that we reconsider reinstating her appeal of the order awarding fees to Marquis Auerbach Coffing. To the extent appellant asks that we reconsider the dismissal of the appeal in Docket No. 72766, we are unable to do so in the context of a letter. Appellant was required to file a petition for rehearing in accordance with NRAP 40. We note, however, that the time to file a petition for rehearing in that matter has long since expired.18-21239
06/15/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Supplemental Response.18-22885
06/15/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record on Appeal.18-22887
06/18/2018Other Incoming DocumentFiled Respondent's Declaration in Support of Supplemental Response, and Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record on Appeal.18-23068
06/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental appendix received on June 18, 2018.18-24238
06/26/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Supplemental Appendix.18-24243
07/26/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP18-MC/RP/LS.18-28845
08/21/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-32466
08/21/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 27, 2018.18-32466