Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72930
Short Caption:FORTUNET, INC. VS. PLAYBOOK PUBL'G, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):64427, 65632, 69747
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A645734Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/02/2019 at 2:00 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:04/02/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/03/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) (PART 1)17-14650
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. (PART 2)17-14651
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (1st Amended NOA - PART 1)17-14654
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (1st Amended NOA - PART 2)17-14655
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (2nd Amended NOA - PART 1)17-14660
05/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (2nd Amended NOA - PART 2)17-14662
05/03/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Exemption from Settlement Program/File Documents. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 120 days.17-14667
05/05/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Hartwell Thalacker. Check no. 1360.
05/18/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Cross-Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
05/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (PART 1)17-16707
05/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Cross-Appeal. (PART 2)17-16708
05/19/2017Transcript RequestFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 05/05/17. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins.17-16800
05/22/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Jack B. Coronel (Respondent/Cross-Appellant). Check no. 6940.
05/25/2017MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.17-17584
06/01/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement due: June 7, 2017.17-18229
06/05/2017Docketing StatementFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-18505
06/13/2017Docketing StatementFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Response to Docketing Statement.17-19540
06/28/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 05/15/17.17-21557
08/17/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent FortuNet, Inc.'s Motion For Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.17-27528
08/17/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 29, 2017.17-27544
09/29/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent FortuNet, Inc.'s Second Motion For Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.17-33120
09/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Respondents/Cross-Appellants' Response for Cross-Appeal due: 30 days. Appellant/Cross-Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that respondent/cross-appellants' response is served.17-33146
10/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion as Moot. Appellant/cross-respondent's motion for a second extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix is denied as moot.17-33575
10/04/2017MotionFiled Respondent Coronel Parties Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Second Extension.17-33584
10/23/2017MotionFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.17-36301
11/06/2017MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent FortuNet's Reply to Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause.17-37824
11/17/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Dismissing Cross-Appeal in Part and Reinstating Briefing. The cross-appeal shall continue as it relates to the order awarding attorney fees only. Appellant/cross-respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix.17-39715
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 1-11.17-43768
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 12-16.17-43770
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 17-18.17-43771
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 19-22.17-43774
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 23-32.17-43775
12/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vols. 33-35.17-43776
12/19/2017MotionFiled Counsel for Respondents/Cross-Appellants Notice of Withdraw of Counsel.17-43792
12/19/2017MotionFiled Appellant FortuNet's Motion to For Extension of Time to File Opening Brief or in the alternative to File Late Opening Brief.17-43912
12/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief or in the alternative to File Late Opening Brief.17-43944
12/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 22, 2-17.17-44122
12/26/2017BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Opening Brief.17-44435
12/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for respondents/cross-appellants have filed a "notice of withdrawal of counsel." The notice is disapproved. The law firm of Morris, Sullivan, Lemkul & Pitegoff, LLP, and Daniel S. Cereghino and Jeffrey I. Pitegoff shall continue to be listed as counsel of record for respondents/cross-appellants on the docket of this appeal.17-44571
01/16/2018MotionFiled Motion for Extension to Time to file Answering Brief.18-01978
01/16/2018MotionFiled Jeffrey I. Pitegoff, Esq.'s Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondents.18-01979
01/17/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Respondents'/Cross-Appellants' Opening/Answering Brief and Respondents' Answering Brief.18-02350
01/23/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent (Daniel Cereghino of Fennemore Craig substituting for Jeffrey Pitegoff).18-03264
01/29/2018MotionFiled Notice of Withdraw of Morris, Sullivan, Lemkul & Pitegoff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record.18-03992
02/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents/cross-appellants and respondents shall have until February 26, 2018, to file and serve the answering briefs on appeal and the combined answering brief/opening brief on cross appeal. Thereafter, appellant/cross-respondent shall have 30 days to file a single combined brief replying to respondents' answering briefs, if deemed necessary, and answering respondents/cross-appellants' opening brief on cross-appeal. Respondents/cross-appellants will thereafter have 14 days from service of appellant/cross-respondent's answering brief on cross-appeal to file and serve a reply brief on cross appeal, if deemed necessary. The clerk of this court shall substitute attorney Daniel S. Cereghino of Fennemore Craig, P.C., for attorney Jeffrey I. Pitegoff as counsel of record for respondents/cross-appellants in this appeal and cross-appeal. fn1[We take no action on the motion for extension of time filed on January 16, 2018.] fn2[We take no action on Mr. Pitegoff's motion to withdraw as attorney of record, filed on January 16, 2018, in light of the substitution of attorneys and Mr. Pitegoff's notice of withdrawal of his motion to withdraw.]18-04690
02/21/2018MotionFiled Second Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Answering Brief and Opening Cross-Apeal Brief for Respondents/Cross-Appellants Playbook Publishing, LLC, Playbook Managements, Inc.18-06762
02/27/2018BriefFiled Answering Brief for Respondents Himelfarb & Associates and Bruce Himelfarb.18-07588
02/27/2018AppendixFiled Respondents Himelfarb & Associates and Bruce Himelfarb's Appendix for Answering Brief Vol. 1.18-07595
03/07/2018MotionFiled Second Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Answering Brief and Opening Cross-Appeal Brief for Respondents/Cross-Appellants DeWayne Wooten, Rosalina Wooten, Jack Coronel, and Wooten Consulting.18-09013
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. Respondents cross-appellants and respondents DeWayne Wooten and Rosalina Wooten shall have 11 days from the date of this order, to file and serve the answering briefs on appeal and the combined answering brief/opening brief on cross-appeal. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extraordinary circumstances and extreme need.18-09160
03/20/2018BriefFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Combined Answering Brief on Appeal and Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal.18-10783
03/20/2018AppendixFiled Respondent/Cross-Appellants' Appendix Vol. 1.18-10785
03/22/2018BriefFiled Respondent DeWayne Wooten's Joinder to Answering Brief Filed by Respondent/Cross-Appellant Playbook Parties.18-11159
03/22/2018BriefFiled Respondent Rosalina Wooten's Joinder to Answering Brief Filed by Respondent/Cross-Appellant Playbook Parties.18-11161
03/28/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply/Answering Brief due: May 7, 2018.18-11981
05/08/2018MotionFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion For Extension of Time to File Reply to Answering Briefs and Cross-Appeal.18-17375
05/08/2018MotionFiled Respondents Himelfarb & Associates and Bruce Himelfarb's Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time.18-17505
05/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Respondents Himelfarb & Associates and Bruce Himelfarb's Opposition to Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time.18-17622
05/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant/cross-respondent's Combined Reply Brief due: May 18, 2018. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 14 days from the date of service of the combined brief to file and serve a reply brief on cross-appeal, if deemed necessary.18-18764
05/21/2018BriefFiled Appellant/Cross-Respondent FortuNet's Reply to Respondents' Answering Briefs and Answer to Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief.18-19223
06/05/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Reply Brief due from Rerspondent/Cross-Appellants: 5 days.18-21242
06/06/2018BriefFiled Respondents/Cross-Appellants Playbook Publishing, LLC, Playbook Management, Inc., Jack Coronel and Juli Rosten's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal.18-21588
06/06/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/26/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument. (SC).19-08806
03/06/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on April 2, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. (SC)19-09976
03/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This matter is set for oral argument on April 2, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Las Vegas. Respondents DeWayne Wooten and Rosalina Wooten are pro se respondents in this appeal. Generally, pro se litigants are not permitted to participate in oral arguments and will not be permitted to participate in the oral argument of this matter. Further, Wooten Consulting is unrepresented on appeal and may not appear in this matter without counsel. (SC)19-12644
03/26/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-13242
04/02/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
06/25/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn1[The clerk of this court is directed to amend the caption on this court's docket in accordance with this order's caption.] SNP19-JH.LS/AS (SC)19-27366
07/22/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)19-30763
07/22/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
08/13/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 29, 2019. (SC)19-30763