Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72931
Short Caption:SFR INVESTMENTS POOL 1, LLC VS. BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. District Court
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/21/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/03/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due.
05/03/2017Order/IncomingFiled Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, U.S. District Court Judge.17-14710
06/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Accepting Certified Question, Directing Briefing and Directing Submission of Filing Fee. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve opening briefs. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date the last opening brief is served to file and serve an answering brief. Appellants shall then have 20 days from the date the answering brief is served to file and serve any reply briefs. Appellants and respondent shall each tender to the clerk of this court, within 11 days from the date of this order, the sum of $125, representing half of the filing fee.17-19448
06/13/2017Filing FeeAppellant Star Hill Homeowners Association's Filing Fee Paid. $83.33 from Law Offices Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders - check no. 200837.
06/19/2017Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 3720 in the amount of $125.00 returned to SFR Investments Pool.
06/22/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $41.67 from SFR Investments Pool, LLC. Check No. 3711.
06/27/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $125.00 from Akerman LLP. Check No. 26000940.
07/14/2017BriefFiled Appellant SFR Investment's Opening Brief.17-23438
07/14/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.17-23441
07/14/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant SFR Investment's Statutory Addendum.17-23444
07/19/2017BriefFiled Nevada Legislature's Amicus Curiae Brief.17-23955
08/14/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Answering Brief).17-26977
08/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant Star Hill Homeowners Opening Brief due: 11 days. Respondent shall have until October 5, 2017, to file and serve an answering brief that responds to SFR's opening brief and to any opening brief filed by Star Hill.17-28137
09/06/2017BriefFiled Appellant Star Hill Homeowners Association's Substantive Joinder to Appellant SFP Investments Pool 1, LLC's Opening Brief.17-29792
10/04/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-33746
10/24/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time (Reply Briefs).17-36511
10/24/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Briefs due: November 27, 2017.17-36515
11/28/2017BriefFiled Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Reply Brief.17-40870
12/11/2017BriefFiled Appellant Star Hill Homeowners Association's Joinder to Appellant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Reply Brief.17-42557
12/11/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/08/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address (Akerman LLP).18-01002
03/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-10980
08/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Natalie Winslow for Respondent The Bank of New York Mellon).18-29577
08/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Tenesa Powell for Respondent The Bank of New York Mellon).18-29578
08/02/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Question answered." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 58. EN BANC18-29635
08/27/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-33354
08/27/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.