Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72942
Short Caption:YBARRA, JR. (ROBERT) VS. WARDEN (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - HC-1702005Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/04/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-14843
05/19/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification Under NRAP 9(a)).17-16823
05/24/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-17486
09/01/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-29480
09/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2017.17-30546
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 1 of 7.17-41327
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 2 of 7.17-41328
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 3 of 7.17-41329
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 4 of 7.17-41330
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 5 of 7.17-41331
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 6 of 7.17-41332
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. 7 of 7.17-41333
12/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-41354
12/29/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Answering Brief due: January 16, 2018.17-45005
01/16/2018BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.18-02098
02/15/2018MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Reply Brief.18-06344
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 16, 2018.18-07688
03/16/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-10507
03/16/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38418
10/01/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-40807
11/07/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-45857
11/08/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay the Remittitur. (SC)19-46051
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Issuance of the Remittitur. This court hereby stays issuance of the remittitur until March 31, 2020. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 31, 2020, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 31, 2020, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC).19-47714
02/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled from US Supreme Court - The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on January 28, 2020, extended the time to and including April 3, 2020. (SC)Y20-04673