Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72949
Short Caption:GONOR VS. DALECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A653755Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:05/17/2017 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/21/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/04/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
05/04/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-14881
05/04/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-14883
05/12/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Ryan Alexander Chtd. Check no. 1289.
05/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statements mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-16120
05/17/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel.17-16522
06/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-18778
06/06/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).17-18790
06/14/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for August 17, 2017 at 9:00 a.m.17-19762
09/18/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-31447
09/20/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-31799
09/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/28/16, 10/20/16, 12/06/16, 01/10/17, 03/02/17. To Court Reporter: Dept 19.17-33026
12/18/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Appellant's Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.17-43685
12/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 17, 2018.17-43714
01/18/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.18-02428
01/18/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-02430
01/22/2018MotionFiled Court Recorder's Motion Requesting Extension to File Transcript.18-02821
01/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Reporter Christine Erickson's Notice of Delivery of Transcripts due: 11 days.18-03968
02/06/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Firm Name Change. Morris, Sullivan, Lemkul & Pitegoff LLP has become Morris, Sullivan & Lemkul ,LLP.18-05003
02/13/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Respondents' Opening/Answering Brief (First Request).18-06009
02/13/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 22, 2018.18-06016
03/23/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-11411
04/23/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.18-15431
04/23/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument.18-37086
12/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Douglas, C.J. Majority: Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 109. EN BANC (SC)18-910531
01/15/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC).Y19-02158
01/15/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Ryan E. Alexander. (SC).