Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 72988
Short Caption:FRANKS (KENNETH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C311519Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/12/2018 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:10/12/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/10/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/10/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-15540
06/01/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement.17-18260
06/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement is granted. The clerk of this court shall file the docketing statement received on June 1, 2017. Appellant was required to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request by May 25, 2017. To date, the required document has not been filed with this clerk of this court. Transcript Request Form or Certificate of no Transcript Request due: 11 days.17-18746
06/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals. 17-18762
06/08/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/28/16, 11/29/16, 11/30/16, 12/01/16, 12/02/16, 12/05/16, 12/06/16, 12/07/16, 01/25/17, 03/08/17, 03/29/17. To Court Reporter: Lara Corcoran.17-19004
07/21/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Lara Corcoran stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/28/16, 11/29/16, 11/30/16, 12/01/16, 12/02/16, 12/05/16, 12/06/16, 12/07/16, 01/25/17, 03/08/17, 03/29/17. .17-24231
09/08/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief.17-30111
09/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 23, 2017.17-30498
10/20/2017MotionFiled Motion to File Appendix Under Seal.17-36034
10/24/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-36410
11/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion to file the entire appendix under seal is denied. Within 15 days from the date of this order, appellant shall file and serve an appendix with all information required to be confidential under NRS 200.3771 redacted. Within the same time period, appellant shall serve an unredacted copy of the appendix upon respondent. The clerk of this court shall file the unredacted appendix received on November 2, 2017, under seal. Answering Brief due: 45 days.17-38231
11/07/2017AppendixFiled - SEALED - Appellant's Appendix, Vols. 1 thru 3, and Erratum to Appendix.
11/14/2017AppendixFiled Redacted Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.17-39230
11/14/2017AppendixFiled Redacted Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.17-39231
11/14/2017AppendixFiled Redacted Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.17-39232
12/22/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-44393
12/22/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.17-44394
01/22/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-02870
01/22/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/01/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-16453
08/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, October 12, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-32730
09/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-37924
10/12/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. (MC/RP/LS).
01/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. SNP18-MC/RP/LS (SC)19-00263