Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73000
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58101, 61006, 74070, 74070-COA, 74859, 74859-COA, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492, 80493
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224572Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/04/2017How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/10/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
05/10/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-15722
06/15/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Pro Bono Counsel (Michael Schwarz).17-19897
06/15/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time.17-19899
07/14/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/05/17. Finding of Fact, Conclusion of Law and Order (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 07/14/2017 - C224572-2).17-23474
08/28/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Record and Regarding Briefing. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. We direct the clerk of this court to file the informal brief received on July 6, 2017.17-28725
08/28/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Proper Person Informal Brief.17-28726
08/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Proper Person Notice of Change of Address/Request for Answer on Why Appellant's Informal Brief Hasn't been Filed.17-28928
09/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting the appointment of counsel. We deny the motion.17-30722
09/21/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-15 (via FTP).17-31985
09/21/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 16-30 (via FTP).17-31986
09/21/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 31-45 (via FTP).17-31987
09/21/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 46-60 (via FTP).17-31988
09/21/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 61-74 (via FTP).17-31989
09/26/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 43-50, 1750-1760, 1787-1788, 1830, 1880-1882, 2116-2121, 2147-2149, 2170-2172, 2174-2179, 2182-2184, 2711-2715, 2720, 2919-2924, 9475-9485, 9601-9607, 11555-11713 (SEALED).
09/26/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 9475-9485 (SEALED).
10/04/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
11/08/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Stay Case No. 73000.17-38344
11/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's motion to stay this appeal is denied.17-39369
12/15/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Case No. 74070 With Case No. 73000.17-43367
01/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to consolidate this appeal with an original writ proceeding filed in Docket No. 74070. The motion to consolidate is denied as moot.18-01511
02/15/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-06321
03/15/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-10254
03/15/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 20, 2018.18-10254