Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73031
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF JAMES COLINCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Appeal
Disqualifications:Cherry, Douglas, Gibbons, Hardesty, Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:District Judge Schlegelmilch for Justice Cherry<br/>District Judge Lane for Justice Douglas<br/>District Judge Hardy for Chief Justice Gibbons<br/>District Judge Freeman for Justice Hardesty<br/>District Judge Wanker for Justice Parraguirre<br/>District Judge Young for Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/29/2017How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/15/2017Filing FeeFiling fee waived. Bar Matter.
05/15/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. I and II.17-16057
05/15/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vol. II (cont..).17-16058
05/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. Due date: 30 days. If no opening brief is filed, the matter will be submitted for decision on the record without briefing or oral argument.17-16060
06/16/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.17-20139
06/23/2017BriefFiled Opening Brief.17-20915
07/27/2017BriefFiled State Bar of Nevada's Answering Brief.17-24982
08/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled State Bar of Nevada's Amended Certificate of Service re: the State Bar's Answering Brief.17-26536
09/13/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
09/14/2017BriefFiled Reply Brief.17-30937
09/29/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting Case for Decision Without Oral Argument.17-33233
07/16/2018OtherChief Justice Michael L. Douglas disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018OtherJustice Michael A. Cherry disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018OtherJustice Mark Gibbons disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018OtherJustice James W. Hardesty disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge David Hardy appointed to sit in the place of Chief Justice Michael L. Douglas .18-26999
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Nathan Young appointed to sit in the place of Justice Michael A. Cherry.18-27000
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Scott Freeman appointed to sit in the place of Justice Mark Gibbons.18-27001
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Kimberly Wanker appointed to sit in the place of Justice Kristina Pickering.18-27002
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge Robert Lane appointed to sit in the place of Justice James W. Hardesty.18-27003
07/16/2018Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. Judge John Schlegelmilch appointed to sit in the place of Justice Ron Parraguirre.18-27004
09/19/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Attorney suspended." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich, J., Hardy, D.J., Young, D.J., Freeman, D.J., Wanker, D.J., Lane, D.J. Schlegelmilch, D.J, concurring in part and dissenting in part. fn1[Chief Justice Mark Gibbons and Justices Kristina Pickering, James W. Hardesty, and Ron D. Parraguirre voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter. Before their retirements, Justices Michael L. Douglas and Michael A. Cherry also voluntarily recused themselves. The Governor then appointed district court judges David A. Hardy, Nathan Tod Young, Scott Freeman, Kimberly A. Wanker, Robert W. Lane, and John Schlegelmilch to sit in place of the six recused justices. Justices Elissa F. Cadish and Abbi Silver therefore did not participate in the decision of this matter.] 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 43. (SC)19-39056