Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73117
Short Caption:SARFO VS. STATE, BD. OF MED EXAM'RSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73117-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A752616Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/30/2017 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/25/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Due.
05/25/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-17561
05/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-17563
05/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-17566
05/25/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Jacob L. Hafter
05/25/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Emergency Motion Which Exceeds Page Limits.17-17585
05/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the "Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to NRAP 8" received on May 25, 2017. Appellant shall have until June 1, 2017, to file and serve an emergency motion for injunctive relief of no more than 20 pages.17-17844
05/30/2017MotionFiled Emergency Motion for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to NRAP 8.17-17938
05/30/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt.17-17939
05/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has filed an emergency motion for injunctive relief pending resolution of the appeal. We elect to transfer the motion to the court of appeals for resolution. We clarify that, at this time, only appellant's motion is transferred to the court of appeals, and the transfer is for the limited purpose of resolving the motion. The case will otherwise proceed in the supreme court until further order of this court, and all future documents not related to the motion shall be filed in this court. The clerk shall transfer the documents related to the motions to the court of appeals; all other documents remain filed in this court. The clerk shall file this order in both this court and the court of appeals. fn1[If parties wish to file any additional documents related to the motion for injunctive relief, such documents shall be captioned "In the Court of Appeals of the State of Nevada." Additionally, as electronic filing is not available in the court of appeals, all documents filed in that court must be filed in person, by mail or third-party commercial carrier, or if appropriate, by deposit in the Supreme Court drop box or facsimile.]17-17952
05/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-17953
06/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.17-20786
06/22/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-20818
06/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).17-20825
06/23/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge).17-20933
07/12/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-23217
07/13/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-23391
08/25/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-28553
08/29/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript.17-28938
10/18/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Untimely Brief.17-35736
10/23/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on October 18, 2017. Answering Brief due: 30 days.17-36286
10/23/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-36289
10/23/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Appendix Volume 1, part 117-36290
11/22/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-40461
11/22/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.17-40463
01/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed.
06/25/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED. However, on the issues of attorney fees and costs, we conclude that we lack jurisdiction to consider Dr. Sarfo's arguments regarding the special order." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-24058
07/05/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion To Reissue Order As An Opinion.18-25555
11/01/2018Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn2[We grant motion and publish this opinion in place of our earlier order.] Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty/ Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 85. NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-42843