Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73143
Short Caption:DUNHAM (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 16CR0159Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/12/2018 at 3:00 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/12/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/31/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal.
05/31/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-18144
06/14/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-19671
06/20/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kathy Jackson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/13/17, 02/14/17, 02/15/17.17-20381
09/26/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-32587
09/26/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volumes 1-3.17-32588
10/25/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: November 9, 2017.17-36656
11/09/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-38769
12/01/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-41398
12/01/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
04/25/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-15770
05/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 12, 2018, at 3:00 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-16657
05/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-19620
06/12/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel.
09/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Pickering/Gibbons. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-34702
10/01/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-38314
10/01/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/04/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2018.18-38314