Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73154
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR170210Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:07/09/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:07/09/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/01/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-18303
06/21/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/26/17. Corrected Judgment.17-20493
06/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District Court Order due: 35 days.17-20767
07/03/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order Appointing Counsel. Washoe County Public Defender Appointed as Counsel for Appellant. Filed in district court on 6/30/17.17-22056
07/07/2017Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 06/30/17. Order.17-22493
07/10/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John Reese Petty as counsel for the Appellant).17-22644
07/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Setting Briefing Schedule. Pursuant to a limited remand, the district court has appointed Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. Transcript Request Form due: 20 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 120 days.17-22729
07/10/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (John Reese Petty as counsel for the Appellant).17-22736
07/11/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/25/17. To Court Reporter: Molezzo Reporters.17-22949
07/18/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-23857
08/03/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Christina Marie Amundson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/25/17.17-25837
11/07/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-38090
11/07/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix.17-38092
12/07/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).17-42239
12/07/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: January 8, 2018.17-42241
01/09/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-01051
02/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-04675
02/02/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/17/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-18956
05/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, July 9, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-20221
06/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-24480
07/09/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Cherry, J. Majority: Cherry/Douglas/Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 95. EN BANC (SC)18-907301