Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Combined Case Information: 73175
Short Caption:TRICARICHI VS. COÖPERATIEVE RABOBANK, U.A.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A735910Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:PickeringCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/06/2017 / Tanksley, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/23/2019 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:01/23/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/02/2017Filing FeeFiling fee due for Appeal.
06/02/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-18481
06/02/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Lawyers and Judges
06/02/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-18483
06/02/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael K. Wall
06/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-18592
06/06/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas J. Tanksley.17-18750
06/09/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Address (Morris Law Group).17-19082
06/16/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-20131
06/22/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-20810
06/23/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-20995
07/07/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-22548
09/19/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-31672
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. I.17-31673
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. II.17-31674
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. III, Part 1.17-31675
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. III, Part 2.17-31676
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. IV.17-31678
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. V.17-31681
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. VI.17-31680
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. VII.17-31682
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. VIII.17-31685
09/19/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. IX.17-31691
10/19/2017BriefFiled Respondents' Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A. and Utrecht-America Finance Co.'s Answering Brief.17-35857
10/20/2017BriefFiled Respondent Seyfarth Shaw LLP's Answering Brief.17-35987
11/20/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.17-39921
11/20/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1.17-39922
11/20/2017Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
03/29/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.18-12036
08/01/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents Cooperative Rabobank, U.A. and Utrecht-America Finance Co.'s Notice of Available Dates for Oral Argument.18-29493
12/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument The 2019 Sothern Nevada will hold oral argument in this matter on January 23, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC).18-907032
01/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-01370
01/10/2019BriefFiled Respondent Seyfarth Shaw LLP's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)19-01623
01/15/2019BriefFiled Respondents Rabobank and Utrecht's Notice of Supplemental Authorities. (SC)19-02175
01/23/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP19-JH/LS/AS.
03/12/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address - Chris Paparella, Esq. (Pro Hac Vice) counsel for respondents.19-11015
05/02/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 11. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-19263
05/28/2019RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC).19-23009
05/28/2019Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC).
06/17/2019RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 31, 2019. (SC)19-23009