Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73182
Short Caption:SCOTT (CHRISTIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):81071
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR161210Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/07/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/07/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement and Notice of Briefing Schedule mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-18881
06/12/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-19215
07/11/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Erin Ferretto stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/28/17.17-22964
10/04/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to file Opening Brief.17-33620
10/04/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due: November 6, 2017.17-33630
11/06/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.17-37837
11/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 6, 2017.17-40174
12/05/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extention of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.17-41769
12/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 5, 2018.17-43643
01/02/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief and Joint Appendix.18-00151
01/11/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received on January 9, 2018.18-01517
01/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-01518
01/11/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume One.18-01519
01/11/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Two.18-01527
01/11/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Three.18-01520
01/11/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Four.18-01521
01/11/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix - Volume Five.18-01522
02/12/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Enlargement of Time (Answering Brief).18-05695
02/12/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: March 14, 2018.18-05704
03/14/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-10180
04/13/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief.18-14285
04/13/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening
07/26/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP18-KP/MG/JH18-28803
08/22/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-32741
08/22/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/31/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 23, 2018.18-32741