Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73187
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/07/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/07/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-18926
08/02/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/15/17. Order for Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Response to Supreme Court Email dated 08/02/2017 - C246300-2).17-25752
08/10/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP17-MD/MG/KP17-26743
09/05/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-29539
09/05/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/26/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2017.17-29539