Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73224
Short Caption:ECHAVARRIA (JOSE) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):51042, 52185, 52358, 57864, 59155, 59718, 63711, 64310, 68144
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C095399Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:CadishCase Status:Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/30/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/13/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-19581
06/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification Under NRAP 9(a)).17-21597
07/05/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-22136
10/11/2017MotionFiled Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-34706
11/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: November 27, 2017.17-39015
11/28/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-40855
11/28/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol 1 of 1.17-40856
12/28/2017BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.17-44836
12/28/2017AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.17-44837
01/30/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-04092
01/30/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
01/09/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. (SC)
08/02/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Withdraw Appeal as Moot. (SC)Y19-32577
08/13/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Counsel for appellant shall have 21 days from the date of this order within which to supplement the motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit of appellant or counsel as described above. (SC)19-33968
09/03/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Aug. 13, 2019 Order. (SC)19-36759
09/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until September 24, 2019, to supplement the motion to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit of appellant or counsel confirming that counsel has explained to appellant the legal effects and consequences of a dismissal of the appeal and that appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal. (SC)19-37586