Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73274
Short Caption:ROSEN VS. TARKANIANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A746797Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Cadish, SilverCase Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:06/20/2017 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/04/2019 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/04/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Wolf, Rifkin, Shaprio, Schulman & Rabkin. Check no. 5064.
06/19/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-20286
06/19/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-20288
06/20/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen.17-20386
07/10/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-22778
09/13/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for October 20, 2017 at 1:00 pm.17-30870
10/23/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 21, 2017.17-36300
01/03/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference has been scheduled to take place on January 26, 2018, at 8:30 am.18-00215
01/08/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Extension of Time for Status Report. The time for filing a Final Settlement Conference Status Report is extended to February 1, 2018.18-00967
01/31/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-04323
02/02/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-04578
02/16/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/25/17. To Court Reporter: Kristy L. Clark.18-06509
02/27/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kristy Clark stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/25/17.18-07637
04/16/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Appellants to File Opening Brief.18-14544
04/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice- Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 4, 2018.18-14549
06/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel. Attorney Marc J. Randazza appearing as counsel for respondent.18-21154
06/06/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief.18-21413
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.18-21414
06/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 2.18-21416
06/12/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Leave to Submit Video Exhibits with Appellants' Appendix.18-22261
07/02/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent to File Answering Brief.18-25002
07/02/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 6, 2018.18-25004
07/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to submit video recordings. We deny the motion without prejudice to appellant's right to file a motion that complies with NRAP 10.18-25647
07/11/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Direct District Court Clerk to Transmit Original Video Exhibits.18-26322
07/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Transmission of Exhibits. Video Exhibits attached to appellants' anti-SLAPP special motion to dismiss pursuant to N.R.S. 41.660 due: 20 days.18-28544
08/07/2018BriefFiled Respondent Danny Tarkanian's Answering Brief.18-30254
08/27/2018MotionFiled Stipulation For Extension Of Time For Appellant To File Reply To Answering Brief (First Request For An Extension As To The Reply).18-33279
08/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellants' Reply Brief due: October 8, 2018.18-33283
10/08/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief.18-39386
10/08/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
01/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, March 4, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. for 30 min. in Carson City. (SC)19-04421
02/05/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties
02/06/2019OtherJustice Elissa Cadish disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties
02/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-07482
02/22/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance at Oral Argument (Marc E. Elias for Appellants). (SC)19-08374
03/01/2019MotionFiled Riley Snyder of The Nevada Independent/Las Vegas requesting a still camera photographer in the courtroom. (Via Fax). (SC)19-09366
03/01/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Riley Snyder of The Nevada Independent is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 2:30 p.m. (SC)19-09451
03/04/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court (SC).
04/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Notice of Voluntary Recusal. I have no personal bias or prejudice concerning any of the parties to this proceeding, nor do I possess any personal knowledge of the facts that are in dispute in this proceeding. However, I believe my impartiality might reasonably questioned because of my friendship with Senator Rosen. Accordingly, I have decided to recuse myself voluntarily. (SC).19-15005