Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73277
Short Caption:STATE, DEP'T OF CORR. VS. LUDWICKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A741032Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/21/2017 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/26/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
06/20/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-20324
06/20/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-20327
06/21/2017Settlement NoticeFiled Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian.17-20634
07/07/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-22590
07/13/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/19/17. To Court Reporter: Bryan Griffith.17-23290
08/15/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Brynn Griffiths stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/19/17.17-27240
08/21/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-27955
08/25/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 45 days opening brief.17-28624
10/05/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Briefing (Opening Brief and Appendix).17-33810
10/05/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 8, 2017.17-33812
11/09/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-38594
11/09/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I of IV.17-38597
11/09/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II of IV.17-38598
11/09/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III of IV.17-38599
11/09/2017AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV of IV.17-38601
12/01/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief.17-41442
12/01/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: January 10, 2018.17-41475
01/03/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-00295
01/26/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Reply Brief due: February 16, 2018.18-03816
02/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-06613
02/20/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/25/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-20177
11/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).18-905462
05/02/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Silver, J. Majority: Silver/Hardesty/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 12. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-19270