Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73286
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF SARGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 16RP000091BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Screening Completed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/23/2017 / Chubb, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Tory M. Pankopf. Check no. 5913.
06/20/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-20458
06/20/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-20462
06/21/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (James Walsh as counsel for the Respondent Rosehill, LLC).17-20610
06/23/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet L. Chubb.17-21001
07/18/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for week of August 18. 2017.17-23821
07/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.17-23867
08/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court issued a notice directing appellants to file the docketing statement. To date, appellants have failed to comply with that notice. Docketing Statement due: 10 days.17-26019
08/08/2017Docketing StatementFiled Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-26224
08/11/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-26901
08/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-28165
08/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-28179
08/23/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-28352
09/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-32161
09/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Amended Docketing Statement. Due: 20 days.17-32405
10/03/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for CD-Rom Containing Audio File of Proceeding and Notice of Transcription of Same.17-33526
10/09/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Docket Entries.17-34138
11/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Amended Docketing Statement due: 11 days.17-38108
11/07/2017Docketing StatementFiled Amended Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-38296
11/20/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Request for Notice of Counsel (Thomas N. Beckom hereby Requests Notice as Counsel for Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation).17-39929
11/22/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (Opening Brief).17-40351
11/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 21, 2017.17-40364
11/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended.17-40395
12/26/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause.17-44444
12/29/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Notice of Completion and Delivery of Transcript.17-44923
01/03/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Copy of District Court Docket Entries.18-00231
05/09/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to File Supplemental Briefs. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve their supplemental brief. Respondents shall have 10 days from service of appellants' brief to file and serve their supplemental brief. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed 15 pages or 7,000 words.18-17587
05/25/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief.18-20128
05/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: June 7, 2018. Respondents shall have 10 days from service of appellant's brief to file and serve their supplemental brief.18-20465
06/15/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion For Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief.18-22891
06/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the supplemental brief received on June 15, 2018. Respondent shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve their supplemental brief.18-24288
06/26/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Supplemental Brief to Order to Show Cause.18-24292
07/11/2018BriefFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Response to the Supplemental Brief Responding to this Court's Order to Show Cause.18-26342
07/11/2018BriefFiled Respondent Rosehill LLC's Supplemental Brief. (In Response to Order to Show Cause filed May 9, 2018.)18-26440
12/27/2018Opinion/Non-DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Appeal may proceed." Appellants: Opening brief and Appendix due: 60 days. Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 105. NNP18-KP/MG/JH (SC)18-910516
02/25/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 11, 2019. (SC).19-08557
03/12/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-10904
03/13/2019MotionFiled Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-11075
03/13/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corp.'s Joinder to Rosehill, LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-11122
04/04/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellants have filed an untimely motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. Respondents oppose the motion and move to dismiss this appeal. Despite appellants' failure to oppose the dismissal motions, this court denies the motions at this time. Appellants shall have until April 10, 2019, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. (SC)19-14652
04/10/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for 1-Day Extension to File Opening Brief. (SC)19-15776
04/11/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. (SC) (STRICKEN PER 04/16/19 ORDER).
04/11/2019AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1 & 2. (SC)19-16046
04/16/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, the motion for an extension of time filed on April 10, 2019, is granted. The opening brief and appendix were filed on April 11, 2019. However, the opening brief is deficient because it lacks a disclosure and a routing statement. The clerk shall strike the opening brief filed on April 11, 2019. Appellants' Amended Opening Brief due: 7 days. (SC).19-16563
04/18/2019BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. (SC)19-17141
04/18/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. (Appellant's Opening Brief). (SC)19-17179
04/26/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Certificate of Service (Opening Brief and Excerpts of Record). (SC)19-18514
05/17/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Answering Brief due: June 3, 2019. (SC).19-21771
05/17/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Answering Brief due: June 3, 2019. (SC).19-21775
06/03/2019BriefFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Answering Brief. (SC)19-24042
06/03/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Certificate of Service (Answering Brief). (SC)19-24059
06/03/2019BriefFiled Respondent Rosehill, LLC's Joinder to Respondent Quality Loan Service, LLC's Answering Brief. (SC)19-24072
08/14/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief Filed. (SC)