Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73312
Short Caption:MCGOWEN VS. DIST. CT. (CRYSTAL)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700281Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/24/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/23/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from William E. Peterson.
06/23/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-20911
06/23/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-20912
06/23/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.17-20913
09/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Real Party in Interest's Answer to Writ Petition due: 30 days. Petitioner shall have 15 days from service of the answer to file and serve any reply.17-31498
10/17/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Real Party in Interest to File and Serve Their Answer to Petition for Writ.17-35527
11/29/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Petitioner to File and Serve His Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-40965
12/04/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulations. The clerk of this court shall file the answer of real party in interest received via E-Flex on November 21,2017. Petitioner's Reply due: December 22, 2017.17-41609
12/04/2017Petition/WritFiled Answer of Real Party in Interest to Writ of Mandamus.17-41610
12/26/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-44445
05/24/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Argument.18-20000
11/21/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Gibbons/Parraguirre/Stiglich. Pickering, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 89. EN BANC (SC)18-905202