Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73351
Short Caption:ANDERSON (ARNOLD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):72102, 74076, 74736
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319021Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/27/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
06/27/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-21375
08/10/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED."SNP17-MD/MG/KP.17-26775
09/05/2017RemittiturIssued Remittitur.17-29543
09/05/2017Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/26/2017RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on September 14, 2017.17-29543