Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73461
Short Caption:EMIL (RODNEY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):28463, 51474, 65627
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C82176Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/26/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/14/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/14/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-23499
07/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-25081
08/01/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-25539
11/08/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief.17-38400
11/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 13, 2017.17-39273
12/13/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-43018
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 1 of 4.17-43019
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 2 of 4.17-43020
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 3 of 4.17-43028
12/13/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix to Opening Brief Vol 4 of 4.17-43030
01/12/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-01768
02/12/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: February 26, 2018.18-05691
02/26/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-07292
02/26/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38417