Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73465
Short Caption:CASTILLO (WILLIAM) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):40982, 56176
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133336Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/08/2019 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:01/08/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/17/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-23599
08/07/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-26148
08/21/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-27867
08/25/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification under NRAP 9(a)).17-28534
11/13/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief.17-38893
11/20/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 12, 2018.17-39990
02/12/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-05641
02/12/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-05642
03/12/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-09480
04/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-13998
04/11/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
12/10/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on January 8, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Appellant shall be allowed 20 minutes to present their respective arguments, and respondent shall be allowed 20 minutes to present its argument. The oral argument shall be limited to a total of 40 minutes. (SC).18-907859
12/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Oral Argument. This appeal is currently scheduled for oral argument on January 8, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. To accommodate this court's calendar, oral argument in this appeal will begin at 1:30 p.m. on January 8, 2019, in Las Vegas. Argument will be scheduled for 40 minutes. (SC)18-909728
12/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)18-910060
01/07/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (David Anthony and Ellesse Henderson for Appellant). (SC)19-00846
01/08/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision before the En Banc Court. (SC).
05/30/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed". Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Gibbons/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 16. EN BANC (SC)19-23417
06/17/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-26056
06/24/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until July 12, 2019, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. If no petition for rehearing is filed within this time period, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC)19-27042
07/12/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)Y19-29829
07/12/2019Filing FeeRehearing Filing Fee Waived. (SC)