Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73475
Short Caption:STATE VS. DIST. CT. (HEARN (MATTHEW))Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR170502Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/07/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/07/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2017Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
07/17/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, Alternatively, Prohibition.17-23742
08/04/2017Notice/IncomingFiled District Attorney's Notice of Stay of Sentencing Hearing in the District Court.17-25996
09/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing the Filing of An Appendix and Answer. State: Appendix due: 11 days. Real Party in Interest: 15 days from the date the appendix is filed, to file and answer.17-30886
09/21/2017AppendixFiled Petitioner's Appendix.17-32056
09/21/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Motion for an Extension of Time and for Leave to File a Supplemental Appendix.17-32052
10/04/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Party in Interest's Answer Against Issuance of Requested Writ (Answer to Petition for Writ).17-33634
10/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Petitioner has filed a motion for an extension of time to file a supplemental appendix. The motion is denied.17-35663
12/27/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This matter will be scheduled for oral argument on the next available calendar.17-44552
01/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Wednesday, March 7, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-02820
01/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel (Rebecca Druckman to argue on behalf of Petitioner).18-03320
02/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-06438
03/07/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
12/06/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Cherry/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. Douglas, C.J., concurring. Pickering, J., dissenting. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 96. EN BANC (SC)18-907303