Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73484
Short Caption:BENKO VS. QUALITY LOAN SERV. CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A649857Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/21/2017 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:09/05/2019 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:09/05/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court.
07/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-23843
07/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement/Civil. Due date: 10 days.17-23847
07/18/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-23849
07/19/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Appellant's Case Appeal Statement.17-23986
07/19/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent California Reconveyance Company. (Lawrence G. Scarborough and Jessica R. Maziarz appearing as pro hac vice).17-23997
07/20/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.17-24164
07/21/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel for Respondent MTC Financial Inc. dba Trustee Corps. (Michael R. Brooks, Esq. of the law firm of Brooks Hubley, LLP, and Richard J. Reynolds, Esq. and Allan E. Ceran, Esq. of the law firm of Burke, Williams & Sorensen, LLP. appearing on behalf of Respondent MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps.)17-24187
07/21/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Law Offices of Nicholas A. Boylan. Check no. 7313.
07/21/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.17-24279
07/27/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for: TBD.17-25040
08/04/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-25923
08/24/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Initial settlement conference: October 24, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Settlement statements due by email by October 17, 2017.17-28463
09/26/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Attorney Contact Information (Kolesar & Leatham).17-32545
11/01/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-37390
11/03/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-37698
11/17/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-39712
01/11/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time for Filing of Appellants' Opening Brief.18-01658
01/11/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 5, 2018.18-01660
02/28/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Type-Volume and Page Limitations.18-07907
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1.18-08176
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2.18-08239
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3.18-08189
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4.18-08190
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 5.18-08192
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 6.18-08193
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 7.18-08195
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 8.18-08202
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 9.18-08211
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 10.18-08215
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 11.18-08216
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 12.18-08219
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 13.18-08220
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 14.18-08221
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 15.18-08222
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 16.18-08224
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 17.18-08225
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 18.18-08226
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 19.18-08227
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 20.18-08228
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 21.18-08229
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 22.18-08232
03/01/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 23.18-08233
03/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. The motion is denied. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the opening brief received on February 28, 2018. Opening Brief due: 15 days.18-08550
03/08/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-09200
03/08/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Fact Summary as Part of the Appendix (Or as Directed by the Court).18-09260
03/22/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The clerk shall return, unfiled the supplemental fact summary received via E-Flex on March 8, 2018.18-11164
03/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellants' Notice to the Court Regarding Oral Argument.18-11850
03/28/2018MotionFiled Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Answering Briefs.18-11998
03/28/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice - Respondents' Motion Approved. Answering Briefs due: May 9, 2018.18-12015
04/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondent's California Reconveyance Company's Notice of Firm Name Change.18-15855
05/09/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days.18-17651
05/09/2018BriefFiled Respondent California Reconveyance Company's Answering Brief.18-17688
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 1.18-17730
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 2.18-17732
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 3.18-17734
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 4.18-17736
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 5.18-17737
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 6.18-17738
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 7.18-17739
05/10/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix Volume 8.18-17740
05/10/2018BriefFiled Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief.18-17797
05/10/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Substantive Joinder to the Answering Brief of California Reconveyance Company.18-17805
05/10/2018BriefFiled Respondent MTC Financial Inc. DBA Trustee Corps' Answering Brief.18-17872
05/23/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time For Filing of Appellants' Reply Briefs.18-19800
06/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall have until July 13, 2018, to file and serve the reply briefs.18-21199
07/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply to Respondent MTC Financial Inc. DBA Trustee Corps' Answering Brief.18-26313
07/11/2018BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief to Respondent Quality Loan Service Corporation's Substantive joinder to the Answering Brief of Respondent California Conveyance Company.18-26319
07/11/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief to the Answering Brief of Respondent California Reconveyance Company.18-26475
07/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief to Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation's Answering Brief.18-26481
04/09/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)19-15489
08/05/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC)19-32902
08/21/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice (SC).19-35016
08/28/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Ace C. Van Patten for Respondent National Default Servicing Corporation). (SC)19-35963
08/29/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Joint Notice of Supplemental Authority. (SC)19-36301
09/05/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC)
12/26/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Gibbons/Pickering/Parraguirre/Stiglich/Cadish/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 6419-52112
01/10/2020Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Petition for Rehearing. (SC)20-01395
01/10/2020Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Nicholas A. Boylan. (SC)
02/21/2020Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).20-07110
03/17/2020RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)20-10358
03/17/2020Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)