Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73525
Short Caption:CLARK CTY. SCHOOL DIST. VS. LAS VEGAS REVIEW-JOURNALCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):73525-COA, 75534
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A750151Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:07/27/2017 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:07/18/2018 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:07/18/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
07/21/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-24268
07/21/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-24270
07/26/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to file Motion in Excess of Ten-Page Limitation on Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal.17-24829
07/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant has submitted an emergency motion for stay. We elect to transfer the motion for stay to the court of appeals for resolution. Only appellant's motion is transferred to the court of appeals, and transfer is for the limited purpose of resolving the motion. This case will otherwise proceed in the supreme court until further order of this court, and all future documents not related to the motion shall be filed in this court. The clerk shall transfer the motion to the court od appeals. The clerk shall file this order in both this court and the court of appeals. Fn1[We grant appellant's motion to file the excess-page motion and direct the clerk to file the 'Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, or in the alternative Stay Pending Petition for Writ of mandamus or prohibition, Filed Under NRAP 27(e)" received on July 26, 2017.]17-24905
07/27/2017MotionFiled Motion for Stay pending appeal, or in the alternative stay pending petition for writ of mandamus or prohibition filed under nrap 27(e).17-24906
07/27/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-24910
07/27/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian.17-24962
08/11/2017Docketing StatementFiled Appellant's Docketing Statement.17-26840
08/21/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. The EAC was held on August 17, 2017, and counsel agreed this case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement program.17-27957
08/25/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant: 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-28623
09/11/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/14/17 and 7/27/17. To Court Reporter: Peggy, Court Reporter for Department XVI.17-30423
09/26/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/14/17, 07/27/17.17-32685
11/17/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 11, 2017.17-39686
12/11/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-42477
12/11/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volumes 1-2 part 1.17-42479
12/11/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2 part 2.17-42480
01/10/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: January 24, 2018.18-01342
01/25/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-03533
01/25/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume I-IV.18-03535
02/01/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief.18-04543
02/07/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief. (DETACHED CORRECTED BRIEF AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 02/21/18 ORDER.)18-05179
02/12/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Opposition to Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief.18-05696
02/14/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion for File Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief.18-06142
02/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The motion to file an errata is granted. The clerk of the court shall detach the corrected opening brief from the motion filed February 7, 2018, and shall file it separately. We deny the motion to strike. We also deny respondent's request for attorney fees or sanctions pursuant to NRAP 28(j).18-06749
02/21/2018BriefFiled Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief (Corrected Opening Brief).18-06750
02/21/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Reply to Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief.18-06757
02/21/2018MotionFiled Reply to Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to File Errata to Appellant's Opening Brief.18-06763
02/26/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-07341
02/26/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/17/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-18959
05/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument.Argument is scheduled for Monday, July 9, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-20222
06/04/2018MotionFiled Clark County School District's Motion to Continue Oral Argument.18-21168
06/11/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Notice of Non-Opposition to CCSD's Motion to Continue Oral Argument.18-21984
06/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Continue Argument. Appellant has filed a motion to postpone oral argument in this matter. The motion is granted. Accordingly, the oral argument currently scheduled for July 9, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. is vacated and rescheduled for July 18, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Carson City.18-22952
06/27/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-24483
06/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Margaret McLetchie will Appear on Behalf of Respondent).18-24516
06/28/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument (Adam D. Honey will Appear on Behalf of Appellant).18-24730
07/17/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion Requesting Leave to File Supplement to Appendix.18-27076
07/18/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court.
10/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell)18-40328
10/25/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Author: Gibbons, J. Majority: Gibbons/Douglas/Cherry/Pickering/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Stiglich. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 84. EN BANC18-42115
10/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Appendix. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the supplement provisionally received in this court on July 17, 2018.18-42193