Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73620
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ (FERNANDO) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):36859, 44812, 60254
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C162952Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Stayed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/05/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/03/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-25855
08/18/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request (Certification under NRAP 9(a)).17-27695
08/23/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-28351
11/30/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Request for Extension of Time Within Which to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-41207
12/06/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 2, 2018.17-42030
01/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-00190
01/02/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.18-00191
01/31/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-04258
03/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-08464
03/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38424
10/01/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-40808
11/07/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-45863
11/12/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Stay Remittitur Pending Filing of Petition for Writ of Certiorari. (SC)19-46344
11/21/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Stay Remittitur. This court hereby stays issuance of the remittitur until March 31, 2020. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by March 31, 2020, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by March 31, 2020, the remittitur shall issue forthwith. (SC)19-47708
02/03/2020Notice/IncomingFiled from US Supreme Court - The application for an extension of time within which to file a petition for a writ of certiorari in the above-entitled case has been presented to Justice Kagan, who on January 28, 2020, extended the time to and including April 3, 2020.20-04671
02/20/2020Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Stay of Remittitur. Issuance of the remittitur is stayed until April 17, 2020. If the clerk of this court receives written notice by April 17, 2020, from the clerk of the United States Supreme Court that appellant has filed a petition for a writ of certiorari, the stay shall continue in effect until final disposition of the certiorari proceedings. If such notice is not received by April 17, 2020, the clerk shall issue the remittitur. (SC).20-07009