Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73632
Short Caption:BUMA VS. PROVIDENCE CORP. DEV.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700423Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Submitted for Decision
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:09/08/2017 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/05/2018 at 2:30 PMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/05/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Diaz & Galt, LLC. Check no. 2832.
08/04/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-26001
08/04/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-26004
08/25/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Case Appeal Statement identifies Jason Buma (Deceased), and his beneficiaries Kaeceann and Delaney Buma, as the appellants in this matter. However, from the limited record before us, it does not appear that Kaeceann and Delaney Buma were docketed or substituted as parties in the district court, nor have they been substituted as parties in this court. It is therefore unclear to this court on what basis the purported appellants are proceeding in this appeal. Appellant: 10 days of the date of this order, counsel for appellant shall show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to properly name an aggrieved party. Respondents may file a response within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served.17-28608
09/01/2017MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Stipulation to Substitute a Party.17-29491
09/06/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of time to file Docketing Statement.17-29754
09/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals (via E-Flex). FILED PER ORDER OF 9/8/17.
09/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Cause appearing, the parties' stipulation to substitute a party is approved. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall amend the caption and docket of this appeal by substituting Kaceann Buma, as the surviving spouse, and Delaney Buma, as the surviving child of Jason Buma, deceased.17-30062
09/08/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion for extension of time to file the docketing statement. The docketing statement received on September 6, 2017, shall be filed.17-30231
09/08/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-30236
09/08/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.17-30267
10/06/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-33993
10/06/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief.17-34052
10/30/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-36962
01/04/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 5 days. (Disclosure statement is required. NRAP 26.1).18-00506
01/04/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix.18-00508
01/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Corrected Certificate of Service for Appellants Appendix.18-00515
01/04/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Corrected Certificate of Service for Appellants Opening Brief.18-00516
01/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-00592
02/16/2018MotionFiled Stipulation and Order Extending Briefing Schedule.18-06554
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the answering brief received on February 26, 2018.18-07684
02/27/2018BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.18-07685
03/28/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Reply Brief due: April 12, 2018.18-11977
04/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-13188
04/06/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Dist. ct. Order filed 5/12/17 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule.18-35562
09/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk . Dist. ct. Order filed 5/10/17 Order for Briefing Schedule.18-35563
09/11/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Dist. ct. Order filed 2/28/17 Petition for Judicial Review.18-35564
09/24/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-37232
09/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Monday, November 5, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.18-37411
10/22/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-41512
11/05/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the En Banc Court. (SC).