Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73641
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641-COA, 73949, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/07/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
08/07/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.17-26154
08/07/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms-Morris Law Group.
08/07/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms-Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP.
08/07/2017MotionFiled Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Accountant/Client Communications Pending Writ Pursuant to NRAP 8.17-26155
08/07/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-26156
08/07/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.17-26157
08/07/2017MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Pages 119-422 of its Appendix Under Seal and to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus.17-26215
08/07/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-26219
11/30/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Rescinding Transfer to Court of Appeals. On August 7, 2017, this original petition for a writ of prohibition or mandamus, which challenges a district court order granting a motion to compel production of certain communications with petitioner's accountants, was transferred to the court of appeals. Since that time, several additional writ petitions arising from the same district court case have been filed in this court. To ensure that these matters are resolved in a consistent and efficient manner, we rescind the August 7, 2017, notice of transfer, and we recall this appeal to this court for resolution. The clerk shall file this order in both this court and the court of appeals and transfer to this court the amended petition, answers, replies, and all appendices filed in the court of appeals between August 8, 2017, and November 30, 2017. The stay entered by the court of appeals on August 8, 2017, shall remain in place pending further order of this court.17-41224
11/30/2017Petition/WritFiled Amended Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus Volume I and II (SEALED). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
11/30/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Filed Under Seal). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
11/30/2017Petition/WritFiled Real Parties' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Redacted Version). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).17-41243
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Portions Filed Under Seal) with CD-ROM. (TRANSFERRED ROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
11/30/2017AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix to Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Unredacted Copy) with CD-ROM. (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
11/30/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (Redacted). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).17-41245
11/30/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED). (TRANSFERRED FROM COA AND FILED IN SUPREME COURT PER ORDER 11/30/17).
12/04/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[In light of this order, we vacate the stay of the district court's June 14, 2017, order compelling production, which was granted by the court of appeals on August 8, 2017, and continued by this court on November 30, 2017.] EN BANC17-41555
12/29/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-44871
12/29/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.