Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73656
Short Caption:ANDERSEN (CHRISTOPHER) VS. DIST. CT. (CITY OF LAS VEGAS)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):74712, 75208
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C319933Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Habeas Corpus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/2017Filing FeePetition Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/09/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus or Alternatively Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Exhibits attached)17-26449
10/13/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. ORDER the petition DENIED. NNP17-JH/RP/LS.17-34976
10/19/2017Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petitioner's Petition for Rehearing.17-35878
12/13/2017Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). FN1[We direct the clerk of this court to return the appendix which was provisionally received in this court on October 19, 2017.]17-42945
01/08/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing.18-00867
01/08/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.