Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73684
Short Caption:SAN FLORENTINE AVE. TR. VS. JPMORGAN MORTG. ACQUISITION CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66177
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A685780Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/2017 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/11/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-26913
08/11/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-26916
08/11/2017Filing FeeE-Payment $250.00 from Michael F. Bohn
08/11/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-26957
08/16/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost.17-27508
09/05/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-29677
09/07/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement program. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief; and 10 days to file a docketing statement.17-30040
09/08/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-30128
09/21/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/04/17. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent.17-32012
11/27/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief.17-40667
11/27/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief due: January 5, 2018.17-40670
01/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-00760
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 1.18-00761
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 2.18-00762
01/05/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume 3.18-00763
01/29/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Answering Brief due: February 20, 2018.18-03922
02/15/2018MotionFiled Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Second Request).18-06364
02/27/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: March 22, 2018.18-07683
03/21/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-11118
04/19/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-15180
04/19/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/28/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP18-MC/RP/LS18-38017
10/25/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur.18-42144
10/25/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 30, 2018.18-42144