Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73691
Short Caption:BYFORD (ROBERT) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):32207, 32253, 39426, 44072, 44215, 47252, 49862, 50074, 55304, 57849, 61691, 62871, 64268
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C108502Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:None for Justice CherryPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/09/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
08/11/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-26938
08/11/2017OtherChief Justice Michael A. Cherry disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties.
08/28/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-28757
08/31/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-29280
12/12/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-42610
12/12/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.17-42611
01/10/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-01492
02/09/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-05579
02/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38423