Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73693
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 66170, 67347, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693-COA, 73781, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/09/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/11/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Waived - Criminal.
08/11/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-26942
08/14/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Second Notice of Appeal/Proper Person.17-26983
09/19/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Leave of Court to File a Motion for Order to Vacate and Reverse the Trial Court's Action to Adjudicate and Re Characterize Appellant's NRS 34.360 Habeas Petition Filed in the 11th Judicial District Court Case No. PI-16-1076 to an NRS 34.724 Post Conviction Writ in Violation of Appellant's Protected Liberty Interests Under the U.S. Constitution Amendment XIV Per Castro v. United States, 540 U.S. 375 (2003), Thereby Disposing of and/or Overthrowing the Function of NRS 34.360 Through NRS 34.500 so to Eliminate Appellant's Protected Liberty Interests Which are Otherwise Guaranteed by the Nevada Legislature to Prisoners as a Means to Attack Unlawful Restraint of Liberty Brought About by Corruption of State and Unlawful Suspension of the Writ (Nev. Constitution Art. 1 ss 5) Acting in Excess of Jurisdiction.17-31709
10/03/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Enter Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 60 days.17-33496
10/09/2017Order/IncomingFiled District court order. Certified copy of the Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order filed in district court on October 6, 2017.17-34103
10/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Filing of Brief. Order Directing Transmission of Record. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Within 120 days, appellant may file either (1) a brief that complies with the requirements in NRAP 28(a) and NRAP 32; or (2) the "Informal Brief Form for Pro Se Parties" provided by the supreme court clerk. NRAP 31(a)(1). If no brief is submitted, the appeal may be decided on the record on appeal.17-34779
11/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-26 (via FTP).17-37674
11/07/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal (PSI) Pages 1400-1407 (SEALED).
11/07/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 3709, 3713-3716, 5033-5037 (SEALED).
11/15/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant's "Motion for Leave of Court to File a Motion for Order to Vacate and Reverse the Trial Court's Action to Adjudicate and Re Characterize Appellant's NRS 34.360 Habeas Petition . . ." is denied.17-39289
02/02/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief due: February 23, 2018.18-04652
02/15/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief.18-06320
02/22/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Opening Brief.18-07045
03/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We take no action on appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. Appellant timely filed the opening brief on February 22, 2018. Respondent need not file a response to the opening brief unless directed to do so by this court.18-08564
04/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
04/24/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Proper Person Legal Notice.18-15526
05/17/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer Case to Court of Appeals.18-18855
08/14/2018Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
09/17/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/17/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review.18-36313
10/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file a petition for review or rehearing. The motion is denied.18-38919
10/22/2018MotionFiled Proper Person (NRAP 40B) Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review as to Case No. 73693 Due to the Nevada Court of Appeals Refusal to Address the Merits and Claims of Appellant's NRS 34.360 Habeas Corpus Ad Subjiciendum.18-41449
11/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a second motion for an extension of time to file a petition for review of the court of appeals' order of affirmance. We construe the motion as one for reconsideration of our previous order denying his motion for an extension of time to file a petition for review. The motion is denied.18-42901
11/14/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion for Rescission of Order Denying Enlargement of Time to File Petition for Review Under NRCP Rule 40B, for Cause of Bias, Prejudice, and Corrupt Judiciary Calling for Recusal and Review from Non Biased Panel. (SC)18-904077
11/29/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. No good cause appearing, appellant's "Motion for Rescission of Order Denying Enlargement of Time to File Petition for Review Under NRCP Rule 40B, for Cause of Bias, Prejudice, and Corrupt Judiciary Calling for Recusal and Review from Non Biased Panel" is denied. (SC).18-906257
11/29/2018RemittiturIssued Remittitur. (SC)18-906300
11/29/2018Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed. (SC)
11/29/2018OtherReturned Unfiled Document - "Errata Correcting Clerical Errors Regarding Motion for Rescission of Order Denying Enlargement of Time to File Petition for Review...". (SC)18-906346
12/18/2018RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 4, 2018. (SC)18-906300