Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73781
Short Caption:RIMER (STANLEY) VS. STATE, NEV. BD. OF PAROLE COMM'RSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):54555, 57454, 58711, 58896, 65727, 65728, 69326, 69510, 70352, 71451, 71855, 71856, 71857, 71857-COA, 73187, 73693, 73693-COA, 73781-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C246300Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2017Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
08/21/2017Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-27830
08/21/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion to Waive Filing fees for Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-27832
08/28/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Emergency Motion to Stay Commencement of Next Sentence (September 1, 2017) Pending Outcome of the Current Action for Rehearing, or in the Alternative, Order Rehearing for Parole Beginning 2014 Without Inapplicable Aggravator.17-28724
08/31/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-29376
09/01/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[As the filing fee was waived upon the docketing of this matter, we deny Rimer's motion to waive the filing fee as moot.] fn2[Rimer's motion to stay commencement of his "next sentence" pending the outcome of the petition in this matter is denied as moot.] Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG
09/26/2017Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
09/26/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-32698
09/26/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.