Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73785
Short Caption:BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. VS. THOMAS JESSUP, LLC SER. VIICourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A693205Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:En Banc Reconsider Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:Exempt
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Akerman LLP. Check no. 26000994.
08/21/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-27919
08/21/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-27922
08/22/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellants 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief:17-28077
09/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days.17-32170
09/29/2017Transcript RequestFiled Appellant's Certificate that No Transcript is Requested.17-33119
10/02/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement by The Bank of New York Mellon, Bank of America, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.17-33283
10/02/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-33284
12/15/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: January 3, 2018.17-43383
01/05/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix.18-00598
01/16/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief and appendix received via E-Flex on January 4, 2018. Answering Brief due: 30 days.18-02046
01/16/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-02047
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume I, Part 1.18-02048
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume I, Part. 2.18-02049
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume II, Part 1.18-02050
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume II, Part 2.18-02051
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume III.18-02052
01/16/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief, Volume IV.18-02053
02/09/2018Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Amended Case Appeal Statement by Bank of America, N.A. (BANA), Mortgage Electronic Registrations Systems, Inc. (MERS), and The Bank of New York Mellon (BoNYM) (Collectively Appellants).18-05530
02/09/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Amended Certificate of Service. (Appellant's Opening Brief Along with the Notice of Filing Amended Case Appeal Statement).18-05543
02/16/2018BriefFiled Respondent Thomas Jessup, LLC Series VII's Answering Brief.18-06442
02/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Modifying Caption. We conclude that Foxfield Community Association and Absolute Collection Services are respondents to this appeal, and we direct the clerk to revise the caption for this appeal by adding Foxfield Community Association and Absolute Collection Services, LLC as respondents. If any party is of the opinion that the caption, as modified, does not accurately reflect the status of the parties to this matter, or if attorney Shane Cox does not represent either or both Foxfield Community Association and Absolute Collection Services for purposes of this appeal, they shall notify this court in writing within 11 days of the date of this order.18-06726
02/27/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondent's Answering Brief (Absolute Collection Services, LLC and Foxfield Community Association).18-07764
03/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Foxfield Community Association and Absolute Collection Services, LLC.'s Answering Brief due: March 23, 2018.18-08531
03/06/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Set Single Deadline for Appellants' Reply Brief.18-08691
03/12/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall have 30 days from the service of respondents Foxfield Community Association's and Absolute Collection Service, LLC's answering brief to file and serve a single reply in response to both answering briefs.18-09583
03/23/2018BriefFiled Respondents Absolute Collection Services, LLC and Foxfield Community Association's Answering Brief.18-11481
04/19/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: May 7, 2018.18-15121
05/08/2018MotionFiled Motion to File Appellant's Reply Brief.18-17508
05/14/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on May 8, 2018.18-18282
05/14/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-18283
05/14/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
05/18/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance (Ariel Stern as counsel for the Appellants).18-19157
03/07/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7. SNP19-JH/LS/AS (SC)19-10173
03/25/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent Thomas Jessup, LLC Series VII's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-13120
03/25/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Richard L. Tobler
04/01/2019MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC 'S Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-14251
04/01/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/25/19). (SC)
04/02/2019MotionFiled Motion for Leave to File RJRN Holdings, LLC'S Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-14294
04/02/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae RJRN Holdings, LLC, in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/25/19). (SC)
04/02/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to RJRN Holdings, LLC's Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (STRICKEN PER ORDER 4/25/19). (SC)
04/05/2019MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae, Pro Se, Anthony S. Noonan, In Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC).19-15029
04/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions for Leave to File Amicus Briefs on Rehearing. We direct the clerk of this court to strike SFR's amicus brief, filed on April 1, 2019, to strike RJRN's amicus brief and errata filed on April 2, 2019, and to return, unfiled, Noonan's proposed amicus brief provisionally received in this court on April 5, 2019. (SC)19-18106
04/25/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)19-18107
05/09/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Respondent Thomas Jessup, LLC Series VII's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y19-20469
05/16/2019MotionFiled Las Vegas Development Group, LLC's; LVDG, LLC; Airmotive Investments, LLC; and Thunder Properties, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. (SC)19-21688
05/16/2019BriefFiled Las Vegas Development Group, LLC; LVDG, LLC; Airmotive Investments, LLC; and Thunder Properties, Inc.'s Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Respondent and Supporting Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)19-21689
05/16/2019MotionFiled SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of Respondent's Motion for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)19-21694
05/16/2019BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curaie SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC in Support of Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)19-21695
05/16/2019MotionFiled RJRN holdings, LLC's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Respondent's Petition for Rehearing. (SC) (DETACHED AMICUS BRIEF FROM MOTION AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 07/09/19 ORDER).19-21700
07/05/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellant shall have 14 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve an answer to the petition. We stay issuance of the remittitur in this appeal pending resolution of the petition for en banc reconsideration. (SC)19-28688
07/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Having considered the motions, this court grants leave to file the proposed amicus briefs. The amicus briefs of SFR and Las Vegas Development Group, LLC; LVDG, LLC; Airmotive Investments, LLC; and Thunder Properties, Inc. have been filed. The clerk of this court shall detach the proposed brief from the motion filed by RJRN Holdings, LLC, and shall file it separately. Appellants shall provide any response to the amicus briefs in their answer to the petition for en banc reconsideration. (SC).19-29089
07/09/2019BriefFiled RJRN Holdings, LLC's Amicus Curiae Brief. (SC).19-29090
07/19/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellants' Answer to Respondent's Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (SC)Y19-30672