Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73837
Short Caption:IN RE: CONNELL LIVING TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):66231, 67782, 68046, 69737, 71577, 72766, 72897, 74517, 75107, 75593
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P066425Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Pro Bono Program
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:03/15/2019 at 10:00 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:03/15/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. In Forma Pauperis.
08/28/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-28691
08/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Regarding Deadlines.17-28694
09/07/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days.17-29943
09/14/2017Transcript RequestFiled Proper Person Request for Transcript of Proceedings.17-30947
09/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We decline to order the preparation of the requested transcripts at this time.17-31414
09/21/2017Docketing StatementFiled Proper Person Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-31966
10/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 1-24 (Via FTP).17-33406
10/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 25-41 (Via FTP).17-33407
10/03/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Volumes 42-49 (Via FTP).17-33415
10/05/2017Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Pages 4481-4600, 4601-4782, 4784-4800, 4801-4864, 5824-5853, 7290-7400, 7401-7484, 7519-7526, 7546-7551, 7884-7979, 9037-9041, 9074-9135, 9140-9141, 9243-9302 (SEALED).
01/25/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Pro Bono Counsel. We direct the clerk of this court to transmit a copy of this order and the attached case summary to the Legal Aid Center of Southern Nevada for financial eligibility screening. Appellant's Notice of Appearance of Counsel or LACSN's Notice due: 60 days. Briefing is suspended.18-03633
02/01/2018MotionFiled Proper Person Appellant's Motion (Asking Permission to Present Opening Brief Late).18-04521
02/13/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the informal brief received on February 1, 2018. Briefing of this appeal remains suspended pursuant to our January 25, 2018, order.18-05937
02/13/2018BriefFiled Proper Person Appellant's Informal Brief.18-05939
03/26/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Alexander G. LeVeque, Esq., appearing as counsel for appellant.18-11570
04/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Transcript Request Form due: 14 days. Opening Brief due: 60 days.18-12542
05/16/2018MotionFiled Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opening and Answering Briefs (First Request).18-18716
05/21/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part and Directing Filing of Transcript Request Form. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: July 2, 2018. Because the motion is not signed by counsel of record for respondent, we decline to grant any extension of time to file the answering brief. Appellant's Transcript Request Form due: 11 days.18-19337
06/01/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate for No Transcripts.18-20820
07/02/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-25036
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 1.18-25037
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 2.18-25038
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 3.18-25039
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 4.18-25040
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 5.18-25041
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 6.18-25042
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 7.18-25043
07/02/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Volume 8.18-25044
07/25/2018MotionFiled Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering and Reply Briefs (Second Request).18-28446
07/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Joint Motion for Approval of Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering and Responding Briefs).18-28500
08/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Approving Stipulation. Respondents Answering Brief due: September 4, 2018. Appellant shall have until October 4, 2018, to file and serve the reply brief.18-30496
09/05/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-34479
09/05/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1.18-34483
09/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Answering Brief).18-36013
10/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-39107
10/05/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Reply Appendix Volume 1.18-39123
10/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
02/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Friday, March 15, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-05201
02/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-07493
03/15/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Panel. KP/RP/EC. (SC)
03/21/2019BriefFiled Joint Supplemental Authorities. (SC)19-12457
03/26/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Supplement. (SC)19-13434
03/29/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Vacating in Part, and Remanding. "We affirm the part of the district court's order determining that punitive damages were warranted in this case. We vacate the portion of the order awarding punitive damages, however, and remand for the district court to conduct a second hearing to determine the amount of punitive damages to impose, in compliance with NRS 42.005." NNP19-KP/RP/EC. (SC).19-13921