Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73838
Short Caption:ABRAMS VS. SANSON C/W 75834Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:73838*, 75834Related Case(s):75834
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A749318Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:SilverCase Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Justice Gibbons for Justice SilverPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2017 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/12/2019 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:12/12/2019How Submitted:

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/28/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/28/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-28701
08/28/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-28703
08/31/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Willick Law Group. Check no. 31690.
08/31/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-29311
09/01/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.17-29452
09/21/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-31930
09/29/2017MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 72778/72819/73838.17-33123
10/06/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled: dates being considered by parties.17-34033
10/11/2017MotionFiled Stipulation to Enlarge By One Week The Deadline To File A Response To Non-Party's Motion To Consolidate Appeals.17-34569
11/08/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Respondents in Docket No. 72778 shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve either the answering brief or a properly supported motion for an extension of time. Appellant in Docket No. 72819 has filed motions to consolidate these three appeals. We deny the motion at this time. fn1[Given this order, we take no action on the motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief filed on October 12, 2017.] fn2[The stipulation for an extension of time in Docket No. 73838 is approved. The clerk shall file the partial opposition to the motion to consolidate received on October 18, 2017.] Nos. 72778/72819/73838.17-38420
11/08/2017MotionFiled Respondent's Partial Opposition to Non-Party Brandon Paul Saiter's Motion to Consolidate Appeal Nos. 72819, 73838, and 72778.17-38422
11/22/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 17, 2018, at 9:00 am.17-40375
01/08/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Change of Location of Settlement Conference: New Location - Suite 200, 2753 Howard Hughes Pkwy, Las Vegas.18-00793
02/05/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-04820
02/07/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-05166
02/22/2018Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.18-07044
04/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondents may file a reply within 11 days of service of appellants' response. Briefing is suspended.18-12978
05/07/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Response to the Order to Show Cause.18-17285
07/02/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Reinstating Briefing. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: 60 days.18-25029
08/09/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals. Nos. 73838/75834.18-30691
08/17/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Appeals.18-31901
08/17/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 14, 2018.18-31998
08/20/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions to Consolidate. Appellants Single Opening Brief and Appendix due: September 28, 2018. Nos. 73838/75834.18-32222
09/26/2018MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 73838/75834.18-37708
09/27/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Respondents' Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix. Nos. 73838/75834.18-37829
10/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellants' Opening Brief and Appendix due: October 12, 2018. Nos. 73838/75834.18-38343
10/15/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40276
10/15/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to File Appendix IV Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40277
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume I. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40278
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume II. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40279
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume III. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40280
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume V. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40281
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI, Part 1. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40282
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VI, part 2. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40285
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII, Part 1. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40286
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VII, Part 2. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40287
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume VIII. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40288
10/15/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume IX. Nos. 73838/75837.18-40289
10/15/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Firm Name. (McLetchie Law, f/k/a McLetchie Shell)18-40333
10/18/2018MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief and Countermotion for Dismissal of Appeal. Nos. 73838/75834.18-40956
10/24/2018MotionFiled Respondents' Opposition to Appellants' Motion to File Appendix IV Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75834.18-41954
10/25/2018MotionFiled Appellants' Reply to Opposition to Motion for Leave of Court to Exceed Type-Volume Limitation of Opening Brief and Opposition to Countermotion to Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 73838/75834.18-42197
11/01/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Reply to Opposition to Motion to File Appendix Under Seal. Nos. 73838/75834.18-42857
12/06/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. Appellants have filed a motion for leave to file an opening brief in excess of the type-volume limitation. We grant the motion to exceed the type-volume limitation and deny the motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on October 15, 2018. Appellants have also filed a motion to file the portion of the appendix containing a transcript of a closed hearing in a related family court case under seal. We grant the motion. the clerk shall file volume IV of the appendix, received on October 19, 2018, under seal. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).18-907231
12/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).18-907233
12/06/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume IV. (SEALED). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).
01/03/2019MotionFiled Respondent Louis C. Schneider's Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Answering Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-00311
01/03/2019MotionFiled Respondents Steve W. Sanson and Veterans In Politics International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Appellees' Answering Brief [First Request]. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).19-00433
01/11/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motions. Respondents shall have until February 22, 2019, to file and serve their answering briefs. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of last-filed answering brief to file and serve any reply brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-01775
02/13/2019BriefFiled Respondent's (Schneider Parties) Answering Brief in Docket No. 75834. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-06947
02/13/2019AppendixFiled Respondent's (Schneider Parties) Appendix to Answering Brief in Docket No. 75834. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-06948
02/25/2019BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief (73838). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-08451
02/25/2019AppendixFiled Respondents' Appendix Volume 1 (73838). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-08452
03/25/2019Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Reply Brief due: April 10, 2019. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).19-13145
04/02/2019MotionFiled Stipulation Granting Bailey Kennedy Leve to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Appellants. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-14434
04/09/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall remove Joshua P. Gilmore and Dennis L. Kennedy of Baily Kennedy as counsel for appellants. Appellants remain represented by The Abrams and Mayo Law Firm and Willick Law Group. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).19-15306
04/10/2019BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-15653
04/10/2019Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)
09/17/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, October 15, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.19-38785
09/19/2019MotionFiled Appellants' Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-39208
09/19/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Continue Oral Argument (REJECTED-DUPLICATE). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)
09/23/2019OtherJustice Abbi Silver disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Parties
09/24/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-39694
09/24/2019MotionFiled Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument (REJECTED-DUPLICATE). Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)
09/25/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The oral argument presently scheduled for October 15, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. is vacated. This matter will be rescheduled for oral argument on December 12, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Las Vegas. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).19-39904
10/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on Thursday, December 12, 2019 at 1:30 pm. Nos 73838/75834. (SC)19-44434
10/29/2019Letter/IncomingFiled Our Nevada Judges Letter Requesting to Broadcast and Record Oral Argument. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC).19-44456
10/31/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Media Request. Permission is granted for photographic or electronic media coverage of the court proceedings. Alexander Falconi of Our Nevada Judges is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before 1:30 p.m. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-44735
11/27/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. Nos 73838/75834. (SC)19-48504
12/03/2019Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance for Oral Argument - Margaret A. McLetchie of the law firm McLetchie Law Group PLLC will appear at oral argument scheduled for December 12, 2019 on behalf of respondents, Steve W. Sanson and Veterans in Politics International, Inc. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)19-48960
12/12/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. JH/LS/AS. (SC)
03/05/2020Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded." Before: Gibbons/Hardesty/Stiglich. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Stiglich/Gibbons/Hardesty. 136 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 9. SNP19-MG/JH/LS Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)20-08769
03/20/2020Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Appellants' Petition for Rehearing due: April 6, 2020. Nos. 73838/75834. (SC)20-10926