Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73848
Short Caption:BRANCH BANKING & TR. CO. VS. GERRARD, ESQ.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A744561Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2017 / Saint-Aubin, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/15/2018 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:11/15/2018How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/29/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/29/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-28878
08/29/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-28880
08/31/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright. Check no. 31721.
08/31/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-29330
09/01/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert F. Saint-Aubin.17-29439
09/06/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental.17-29877
09/06/2017Filing FeeReturned Filing Fee. Check No. 31732 returned to Albright, Stoddard, Warnick & Albright.
09/19/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.17-31601
10/06/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 12, 2017.17-34032
11/07/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 12, 2017, at 9:00 am.17-38086
12/18/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. SR17-43604
12/19/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-43884
12/27/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-44628
03/14/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-09998
03/14/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume I.18-10000
03/14/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume II.18-10002
03/14/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume III.18-10004
03/14/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume IV.18-10005
03/14/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Volume V.18-10006
04/06/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time to File Respondents' Answering Brief.18-13179
04/06/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: 5/7/18.18-13181
05/08/2018BriefFiled Respondents' Answering Brief.18-17538
06/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-21266
06/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
09/26/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Thursday, November 15, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas.18-37637
10/24/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.18-41890
11/13/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Respondents' Answering Brief. (SC)18-903941
11/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Errata to Reply Brief in Response to Respondents' Errata to Answering Brief. (SC)18-904072
11/15/2018Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. KP/MG/JH (SC).
12/27/2018Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Gibbons/Hardesty. 134 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 106. NNP18-KP/MG/JH (SC)18-910522
01/11/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-01797
01/11/2019Filing FeeFiling fee on rehearing paid. E-Payment $150.00 from D. Chris Albright. (SC)
01/22/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC).19-03197