Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73863
Short Caption:COKER VS. SASSONECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A742853Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/19/2017 / Singer, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/15/2018How Submitted:On Record And Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/30/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee due for Appeal.
08/30/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.17-29126
08/30/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. No action will be taken on this matter until filing fee is paid. Due Date: 10 days.17-29130
09/15/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Randazza Legal Group. Check no. 1063.
09/15/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant - due: 20 days.17-31183
09/19/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael H. Singer.17-31703
10/10/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for November 2, 2017, at 10:30 am.17-34374
10/10/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days.17-34436
10/23/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-36133
11/01/2017Docketing StatementFiled Respondent Marco Sassone's Response to Docketing Statement.17-37398
12/04/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.17-41700
12/06/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.17-41907
01/12/2018MotionFiled Request to File Request for Transcript of Proceedings After Expiration of Time. (DETACHED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST AND FILED SEPARATELY PER 02/01/18 ORDER.)18-01893
01/25/2018MotionFiled Respondent Marco Sassone's (1) Objection to Defendant Darrell T. Coker's Request to File Request For Transcript of Proceedings After Expiration of Time and (2) Motion to Dismiss the Appeal.18-03517
01/30/2018MotionFiled Appellant's (1) Reply in Support of Request to File Request for Transcript of Proceedings After Expiration of Time; and (2) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Appeal.18-04151
01/31/2018TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Carrie Hansen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates listed.18-04224
02/01/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Regarding Motions. The clerk shall detach the transcript request form from the motion filed on January 12, 2018, and file it separately. fn1 [We deny respondent's motion to dismiss appeal based on appellant's failure to meet the deadline set by this court; but we caution appellant that continued failure to comply with this court's procedural rules may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of the appeal. NRAP 9(a)(7), NRAP 31(d).]18-04435
02/01/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/20/17. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen.18-04436
03/06/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-08900
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. I.18-08902
03/06/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix Vol. II.18-08903
03/16/2018MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend the Time For Filing The Answering Brief, Pursuant to NRAP 26(B)(2).18-10501
03/16/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. (Answering Brief due: May 4, 2018)18-10503
05/04/2018BriefFiled Respondent Marco Sassone's Answering Brief.18-17135
05/04/2018AppendixFiled Respondent Marco Sassone's Appendix of Exhibits - Volume 1.18-17136
05/31/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing the Reply Brief, Pursuant to NRAP 26(b)(2).18-20778
05/31/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: July 5, 2018.18-20791
07/05/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-25542
07/05/2018AppendixFiled Appellant's Supplemental Appendix Volume 1.18-25546
07/05/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
11/15/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. (SC).18-904433
01/03/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Cherry/Parrguirre/Stiglich. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Cherry/Stiglich. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 2. SNP18-MC/RP/LS (SC)19-00270