Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73949
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (OKADA)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 74063, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/12/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
09/12/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition.17-30521
09/12/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms.
09/12/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-30591
09/12/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 2.17-30593
09/12/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 3.17-30597
09/12/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 4.17-30594
09/12/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 5.17-30595
09/12/2017MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to File Pages 76-254, 552-571, 584-755, 765-786, 809-939, and 934-1018 of its Appendix Under Seal and to Redact Portions of its Petition.17-30596
09/15/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Errata to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus and File Portions of its Appendix Under Seal.17-31233
09/27/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk shall file the portions of the appendix received on September 19, 2017, under seal. Petitioner shall have 11 days from the date of this order to submit an unredacted copy of the petition filed on September 12, 2017. Upon receipt, the clerk shall file the petition under seal.17-32863
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 76-254 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 552-571 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 584-755 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 765-786 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 809-939 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
09/27/2017AppendixFiled Appendix Pages 984-1018 to Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively Mandamus (SEALED).
10/31/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter. Disqualification Reason: Law Firms
10/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. These petitions shall be clustered based on overlapping legal issues to ensure they are resolved in a consistent and efficient matter. Nos. 73949/74063.17-37187
11/13/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall have 5 days from the date of this order to submit to this court an unredacted copy of the petition filed on September 12, 2017. Upon receipt, the clerk shall file the petition under seal. Also within 5 days of the date of this order, petitioner shall serve a copy of the unredacted petition upon real parties in interest.17-38932
11/15/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Unredacted Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus (SEALED).
12/04/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC17-41558
12/29/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-44874
12/29/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.