Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73971
Short Caption:CITY OF RENO VS. YTURBIDECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV1700065Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Rehearing Denied
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/14/2017 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/05/2019 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:03/05/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/13/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. State/County/Municipality.
09/13/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-30892
09/13/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-30897
09/14/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick.17-30960
09/26/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for December 4, 2017, at 10:00 am.17-32665
10/03/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-33519
11/14/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 8, 2018, at 10:00 am.17-39187
01/08/2018Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.18-00943
01/10/2018Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 15 days transcript request; 90 days opening brief and appendix.18-01336
01/25/2018Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/21/17. To Court Reporter: Stephanie Koetting.18-03668
04/09/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's Opening Brief due: April 24, 2018.18-13287
04/25/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-15726
04/25/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. I of IV.18-15728
04/25/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. II of IV.18-15729
04/25/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix, Vol. III of IV.18-15730
04/25/2018AppendixFiled Joint Appendix Vol. IV of IV.18-15731
04/25/2018AppendixFiled Addendum to Joint Appendix.18-15732
04/25/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Appellant's Amended Certificate of Service (Opening Brief and Joint Appendix).18-15768
05/23/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief.18-19638
05/23/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 25, 2018.18-19647
06/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected Answering Brief due: 5 days.18-24227
06/26/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-24236
07/13/2018MotionFiled Proposed Amicus Curiae Nevada Justice Association's Motion to Extend Time to File Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Respondent.18-26802
07/25/2018MotionFiled Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.18-28464
07/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: August 8, 2018.18-28466
07/30/2018MotionFiled Proposed Amicus Curiae Nevada Justice Association's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief in Support of Respondent.18-29093
07/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We take no action on proposed amicus curiae Nevada Justice Association's motion for an extension of time to file a motion for leave to file an amicus brief. The motion for leave to file an amicus brief was inadvertently filed on July 30, 2018.18-29188
08/09/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-30675
08/09/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
08/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus brief received on July 30, 2018.18-33015
08/23/2018BriefFiled Brief of Amicus Curiae Nevada Justice Association.18-33017
08/30/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Clarification of Appellant's Position Regarding the Brief of Amicus Curiae Nevada Justice Association.18-33877
02/01/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, March 5, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. for 30 minutes in Carson City.19-05197
02/19/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-07489
03/05/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. KP/RP/EC. (SC)
05/02/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before: Pickering/Parraguirre/Cadish. Author: Parraguirre, J. Majority: Parraguirre/Pickering/Cadish. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 14. NNP19-KP/RP/EC (SC)19-19282
05/20/2019Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. (SC)19-22058
05/20/2019Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $150.00 from Timothy E. Rowe
06/26/2019Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). (SC)19-27424