Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 73984
Short Caption:SHERMAN (DONALD) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY-PC)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):30328, 37191, 47012, 50653
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C126969Classification:Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/11/2018How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/18/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/18/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-31339
10/03/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-33552
10/06/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-34056
01/17/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Request for extension of time within which to file opening brief (First Request).18-02193
02/05/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 15, 2018.18-04796
02/14/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Co-Counsel. (Attorney Stacy Newman with the Federal PD for appellant.)18-06122
02/14/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-06170
02/14/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Volume 1.18-06171
03/12/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-09607
04/11/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-13999
04/11/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/Submitted For Decision.
09/13/2019Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC (SC)19-38421