Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74048
Short Caption:THE ORIGINAL ROOFING CO., LLC VS. CHIEF ADMIN. OFFICER OF THE OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ADMIN.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A740022Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/28/2017 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/22/2019 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:01/22/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/2017Filing FeeFiling Fee Paid. $250.00 from Marquis Aurbach Coffing. Check no. 122172.
09/22/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-32213
09/22/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed.17-32215
09/25/2017Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request.17-32330
09/28/2017Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Issued Assignment Notice to NRAP 16 Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian.17-32995
10/12/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Civil Appeals.17-34932
10/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge (Docketing Statement).17-34934
10/13/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Service (Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge).17-34981
10/16/2017Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Not Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation.17-35350
10/23/2017Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant(s): 45 days opening brief and appendix.17-36161
12/06/2017Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Telephonic Extension. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 21, 2017.17-42035
12/22/2017BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.17-44212
12/22/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 1.17-44214
12/22/2017AppendixFiled Appellant's Appendix, Volume 2.17-44216
01/19/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-02640
02/01/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief.18-04470
02/01/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: March 22, 2018.18-04472
03/23/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief.18-11336
03/23/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/10/2018Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Re: Scheduling of Oral Argument. This court has determined that oral argument may be of assistance in resolving this matter. Accordingly, this matter will be scheduled for oral argument.18-26035
12/04/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Scheduling Oral Argument. The 2019 Sothern Nevada will hold oral argument in this matter on January 22, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., in Las Vegas. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. (SC).18-907036
12/11/2018Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Thomas W. Stewart for Appellant). (SC)18-907948
01/09/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-01367
01/22/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel JH/LS/AS (SC).
06/06/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Stiglich, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. SNP19-JH/LS/AS19-24491