Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74063
Short Caption:WYNN RESORTS, LTD. VS. DIST. CT. (WYNN)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):61966, 68310, 68439, 70050, 70452, 71432, 71638, 73641, 73641-COA, 73949, 74184, 74326, 74500, 74519, 74582, 74591, 75852
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A656710Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Parraguirre, PickeringCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:None for Justice Parraguirre<br/>None for Chief Justice PickeringPanel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2017Filing FeeFiling fee paid. E-Payment $250.00 from Todd L. Bice.
09/26/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Alternatively, Mandamus.17-32505
09/26/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volume 1.17-32516
09/26/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion To File Pages 215-626 Of Its Appendix Under Seal And To Redact Portions Of Its Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Alternatively, Mandamus.17-32638
10/10/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Work Product Protected Materials Pursuant to NRAP 8.17-34434
10/10/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Amended Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Work Product Protected Materials Pursuant to NRAP 8 (Redacted).17-34481
10/10/2017MotionFiled Petitioner Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Work Product Protected Materials Pursuant to NRAP 8.17-34491
10/12/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion Temporary Stay and Directing Answer. We enter a temporary stay of the district court's October 10, 2017, order denying Wynn Resorts' limited motion for a protective order and compelling production. Response to Motion due: 7 days. Petitioner's Reply due: 5 days from response. Answer to Petition due: 15 days. Petitioner's Reply due: 5 days from service of answer. fn1[Petitioner's motion for leave to redact certain portions of its stay motion is granted. Petitioner shall have 7 days from the date of this order to submit an unredacted copy of the motion; upon receipt, the clerk shall file the motion under seal.]17-34769
10/13/2017MotionFiled Petitioner's Amended Emergency Motion Under NRAP 27(e) for Stay of Order Granting Motion to Compel Production of Work Product Protected Materials Pursuant to NRAP 8 (SEALED).
10/17/2017Notice/IncomingFiled Petitioner's Notice Of Related Pending Writ Petition, And Request To Coordinate.17-35546
10/18/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file under seal the unredacted petition for writ of mandamus or prohibition and the appendix to the petition, volumes 2 and 3, all received on October 6, 2017.17-35613
10/18/2017Petition/WritFiled Petition For Writ Of Prohibition Or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED).
10/18/2017AppendixFiled Appendix to Petition for Writ - Volumes 2-3 (SEALED).
10/24/2017MotionFiled Stipulation for Stay of Production.17-36486
10/31/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. These petitions shall be clustered based on overlapping legal issues to ensure they are resolved in a consistent and efficient matter. Nos. 73949/74063.17-37189
11/01/2017MotionFiled Real Party in Interest's Motion to Redact and Seal Portions of Answer and to File Under Seal Portions of Appendix. (DETACHED REDACTED ANSWER PER ORDER FILED 11/22/17)17-37290
11/01/2017AppendixFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Appendix - Volume 1.17-37291
11/07/2017MotionFiled Stipulation To Extend Time To File Petitioner's Reply Brief.17-38106
11/21/2017MotionFiled Wynn Resorts, Limited's Motion to Redact Portions of its Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.17-40161
11/22/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties have filed a stipulation that this Court should stay the production of Dorreen Whennen's notes pending this court's resolution of the petition. We approve the stipulation. The clerk of this court shall detach from the motion filed November 1, 2017, the redacted answer to the petition and shall file it separately. The clerk shall file under seal the unredacted copy of the answer and volume 2 of the appendix to the answer, both provisionally received in this court on November 2, 2017. The stipulation of the parties extending the time for filing the reply in support of the petition, and the motion to redact portions of the reply and to submit an unredacted reply under seal are approved. The clerk shall file the redacted reply and appendix received via E-flex on November 20 and 21, 2017. Petitioner: Unredacted reply due: 11 days.17-40422
11/22/2017Petition/WritFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Answer to Petition for Writ. (Redacted)17-40423
11/22/2017Petition/WritFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Answer to Petition for Writ. (SEALED)
11/22/2017AppendixFiled Elaine P. Wynn's Appendix to Petition for Writ, vol. 2. (SEALED)
11/22/2017Petition/WritFiled Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus.17-40425
11/22/2017AppendixFiled Appendix in Support of Wynn Resorts, Limited's Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus Volume IV.17-40426
11/27/2017OtherJustice Kristina Pickering disqualified from participation in this matter.
11/30/2017OtherJustice Ron Parraguirre disqualified from participation in this matter.
12/01/2017Petition/WritFiled Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Alternatively, Mandamus (SEALED).
12/04/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[In light of this order, we vacate the stay of the district court's October order imposed by this court on November 22, 2107.] EN BANC17-41559
12/29/2017RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.17-44877
12/29/2017Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.