Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74070
Short Caption:MALONE (DOMONIC) VS. THE EIGHTH JUD. DIST. CT.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s):58101, 61006, 73000, 74070-COA, 74859, 74859-COA, 75310, 75310-COA, 80492, 80493
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C224572Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/26/2017Filing FeePetition Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
09/26/2017Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-32738
09/26/2017MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Notice of Motion to Waive Filing Fees for Petition for Writ of Mandamus.17-32739
10/10/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We take no action on appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis for this appeal. The filing fee has already been waived.17-34337
10/12/2017Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Transfer to Court of Appeals.17-34854
12/28/2017Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1 [In light of this order, we deny petitioner's motion to consolidate this matter with the appeal in Docket No. 73000.] Court of Appeals-AS/JT/MG.
01/23/2018Case Status UpdateTransferred from Court of Appeals.
01/23/2018RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur.18-03145
01/23/2018Case Status UpdateNotice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.