Nevada
Appellate Courts
Appellate Case Management System
C-Track, the browser based CMS for Appellate Courts
Disclaimer: The information and documents available here should not be relied upon as an official record of action.
Only filed documents can be viewed. Some documents received in a case may not be available for viewing.
Some documents originating from a lower court, including records and appendices, may not be available for viewing.
For official records, please contact the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Nevada at (775) 684-1600.

Case Information: 74071
Short Caption:AZUCENA (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C321044Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/12/2019 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas
Submission Date:06/12/2019How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

+ Due Items

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2017Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
09/27/2017Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)17-32846
10/10/2017Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 02/02/17, 02/09/17, 02/14/17, 04/04/17, 04/11/17, 04/24/17, 04/25/17, 04/26/17, 04/27/17, 04/28/17, 05/01/17, 05/02/17, 05/03/17, 05/04/17, 05/05/17, 05/08/17, 05/09/17, 05/10/17, 06/22/17, 08/17/17. To Court Reporter: Jill Hawkins and Dalyne Easley.17-34362
10/17/2017Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement Criminal Appeals.17-35410
10/25/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/09/17, 02/14/17, 04/04/17, 04/11/17, 06/22/17, 08/17/17.17-36691
10/25/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jill Hawkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 02/02/17.17-36693
11/14/2017MotionFiled Court Reporter's Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcripts.17-39143
11/21/2017Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Ms. Easley's Court Reporter Certificate due: December 15, 2017.17-40241
12/14/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/24/17, 04/25/17, 04/27/17, 04/28/17, 05/01/17, 05/02/17, 05/03/17, 05/04/17, 05/05/17, 05/08/17, 05/09/17, 05/10/17.17-43164
12/14/2017TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 04/26/17.17-43295
01/25/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Appellant's Opening Brief.18-03577
01/25/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: February 26, 2018.18-03580
02/23/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix.18-07268
03/08/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion in Part. Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix due: April 10, 2018.18-09137
04/10/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Opening Brief in Excess of Type-Volume Limitations.18-13773
04/10/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Transmit JAVS (Court Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 6, 12, and 14).18-13776
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol I.18-13787
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol II.18-13788
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol III.18-13789
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IV.18-13791
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol V.18-13792
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VI.18-13793
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VII.18-13794
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol VIII.18-13795
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol IX.18-13796
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol X.18-13797
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XI.18-13799
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XII.18-13800
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIII.18-13801
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XIV.18-13802
04/10/2018AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief Vol XV.18-13803
04/26/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motions. The clerk of this court shall reject the opening brief received on April 10, 2018. Opening Brief due: 20 days. Appellant's motion requesting this court direct the clerk of the district court to transmit the JAVS recordings of certain hearings below is denied.18-15916
05/17/2018MotionFiled Appellant's Motion to Exceed Opening Brief Word Limit by 838 Words.18-18874
05/23/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief received on May 17, 2018.18-19767
05/23/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Opening Brief.18-19769
06/22/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - First Request (Answering Brief).18-24023
06/28/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: August 21, 2018.18-24640
08/21/2018MotionFiled Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time - Second Request (Answering Brief).18-32575
08/30/2018Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Respondent's Answering Brief due: September 20, 2018.18-33957
09/20/2018BriefFiled Respondent's Answering Brief.18-36938
09/20/2018AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix - Volume 1.18-36939
10/18/2018MotionFiled Stipulation to File Reply Brief.18-41143
10/18/2018Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Appellant's Reply Brief due: November 21, 2018.18-41149
11/20/2018BriefFiled Appellant's Reply Brief. (SC)18-905118
11/20/2018Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening. (SC)
04/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Argument is schedule for Wednesday, June 12, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. for 30 minutes in Las Vegas. (SC)19-18564
05/24/2019MotionFiled Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Transmit Court Exhibit 3, Dated April 9, 2018. (SC)19-22757
05/29/2019Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (SC)19-23269
05/29/2019Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court Exhibit 3 due: 7 days. (SC).19-23309
06/12/2019Case Status UpdateOral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. Before the Southern Panel. JH/LS/AS (SC)
09/05/2019Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Fn1[Because we reverse Azucena's convictions based on the district court's improper conduct during voir dire, we decline to address the remaining issues raised on appeal. Before: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. Author: Hardesty, J. Majority: Hardesty/Stiglich/Silver. 135 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 36. SNP19-JH/LS/AS. (SC)19-37059